Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Southwest Recovery Services, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Carroll, James Brendan, Iii, against 208 E. Louisiana Ltd, Sbbt, Llc, represented by Griffith, Scott, Michaels, Joshua V, Warden, Benjamin L., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 16, 2020 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 16, 2020COUNTER CLAIM
Date: January 29, 2021Final Disposition Hearing
Date: October 05, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 08, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 16, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 02, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 08, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 16, 2020RESPONSE
Date: July 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 15, 2021MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 20, 2021Motion - Leave
Date: July 16, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: August 27, 2021BRIEF FILED
Date: September 01, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 20, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: July 21, 2023ORDER - MISC.
Date: July 20, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 24, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 22, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2020CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: July 16, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: November 22, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 01, 2021Non Jury Trial
Date: October 19, 2021RESPONSE
Date: November 30, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: December 03, 2021RESPONSE
Date: November 29, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 15, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 03, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: November 23, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 19, 2021Non Jury Trial
Date: February 15, 2022MOTION - RECONSIDER
Date: July 28, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 08, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 02, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 08, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 26, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 31, 2023MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: August 01, 2023Motion - Partial Summary Judgment
Date: August 03, 2023SETTLED
Date: August 10, 2023ORDER - RECONSIDER
Date: August 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2020Non Jury Trial
Date: March 02, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 03, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: June 15, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 03, 2021MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 29, 2021MOTION - DISMISS
Date: August 16, 2023Final Disposition Hearing
Date: September 11, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 16, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 24, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 21, 2023Non Jury Trial
Date: July 06, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: March 15, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 28, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 15, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 20, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM - COUNTER PETITION
Date: May 27, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 14, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 26, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 24, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 24, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: September 06, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: February 28, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: October 24, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: March 06, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 11, 2023MOTION - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 03, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 27, 2023RESPONSE
Date: July 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
30 DAY LETTER Final Disposition Hearing (SETTLED * LETTER 8-10-23) |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COPY ORDER TO PARTIES |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
SETTLEMENT LETTER SETTLED LETTER |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFT'S MOTION RECONSIDERATION Motion - Partial Summary Judgment SET FOR 1 HOUR DEFT'S TRAD & NO-EVID P/SJ AND M/RECONSIDER JOSHUA MICHAELS 512 718-3388 **IN PERSON** |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - RECONSIDER GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.