Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cf Dynamic Advances Llc, Dbd Credit Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Carter, E Leon, Litle, Monica, Stahl, Linda R, against Sff, Spangenberg Family Foundation, Techdev Holdings, Llc, represented by Bindler, Mara Jill, Lawhorn, Trevor C, Skiermont, Paul J, Stuckey, Skyler Y, Tautfest, Eric S, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with MOORE, MARICELA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2019 |
CategoryOther Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 05, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 22, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 14, 2019MOTION - PRO HAC VICE
Date: August 05, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 02, 2019MOTION - PRO HAC VICE
Date: August 05, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 05, 2019ORDER - GRANTING PRO HAC VICE
Date: August 12, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 05, 2019RESPONSE
Date: August 08, 2019BRIEF FILED
Date: August 19, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 05, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 05, 2019MOTION - PRO HAC VICE
Date: August 05, 2019MOTION HEARING
Date: August 14, 2019ORDER - GRANTING PRO HAC VICE
Date: August 12, 2019MOTION - DISMISS
Date: September 20, 2019MOTION - STAY
Date: July 05, 2019MOTION - PRO HAC VICE
Date: August 05, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 04, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 05, 2019ORDER - GRANTING PRO HAC VICE
Date: August 12, 2019ORDER - STAY
Date: August 19, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM - COUNTER PETITION
Date: August 12, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 16, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 06, 2019Motion - Dismiss
Date: November 07, 2019AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 04, 2019BRIEF FILED
Date: August 16, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 09, 2019RESPONSE
Date: August 07, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 02, 2019AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 05, 2019MOTION - PRO HAC VICE
Date: August 05, 2019ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 08, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 05, 2019MOTION - STAY
Date: July 05, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 05, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 22, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 18, 2019MOTION - PRO HAC VICE
Date: August 05, 2019MOTION - PRO HAC VICE
Date: August 05, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 05, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 05, 2019MOTION - PRO HAC VICE
Date: August 05, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 05, 2019ORDER - GRANTING PRO HAC VICE
Date: August 12, 2019RESPONSE
Date: August 07, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 06, 2019ORDER - GRANTING PRO HAC VICE
Date: August 12, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 09, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM - COUNTER PETITION
Date: August 12, 2019ORDER - GRANTING PRO HAC VICE
Date: August 12, 2019AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 04, 2019RESPONSE
Date: August 08, 2019AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 30, 2019MOTION - DISMISS
Date: September 20, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 04, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 27, 2019BRIEF FILED
Date: August 19, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 16, 2019ORDER - STAY
Date: August 19, 2019BRIEF FILED
Date: August 16, 2019COUNTER CLAIM
Date: August 07, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: November 04, 2019AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 25, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 14, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: May 22, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: May 19, 2020MOTION - QUASH
Date: August 19, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: July 31, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: August 17, 2020MOTION HEARING
Date: August 14, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 31, 2020DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 14, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: July 31, 2020Motion - Dismiss
Date: November 07, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 17, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 24, 2020MOTION - LEAVE
Date: August 24, 2020ORDER - SEAL
Date: December 09, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 31, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 06, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 25, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: September 08, 2020RESPONSE
Date: August 25, 2020MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: September 15, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 14, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 19, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM - COUNTER PETITION
Date: August 17, 2020REQUEST REPORTER RECORD
Date: February 15, 2021REQUEST CLERK PREPARE RECORD
Date: February 15, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 14, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 24, 2021ORDER - LEAVE
Date: August 31, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 31, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL - CT. OF APPEALS
Date: February 15, 2021ORDER - COMPEL
Date: September 24, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 17, 2020MOTION - SEAL
Date: November 20, 2020ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: September 17, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 27, 2020MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 20, 2020ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: November 05, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 20, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 20, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 15, 2020MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 19, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 23, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 22, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 08, 2020MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 04, 2020RESPONSE
Date: December 04, 2020MOTION - REINSTATE
Date: February 16, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: November 23, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 08, 2020NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: January 20, 2021Non Jury Trial
Date: February 09, 2021MOTION - SEAL
Date: March 24, 2021DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: September 16, 2020MOTION - SEAL
Date: November 19, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 19, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 18, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 04, 2020MOTION - SEAL
Date: December 08, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 13, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: March 11, 2021CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE
Date: February 18, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: March 11, 2021RESPONSE
Date: March 22, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: March 25, 2021COA - NO PAYMENT LETTER
Date: April 08, 2021COA - POST CARD
Date: February 23, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: March 17, 2021MOTION - MODIFY FINAL ORDER
Date: June 07, 2022ORDER - VACATE (POST JUDG MOTION) (OCA and REOPEN CASE)
Date: June 09, 2022ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: July 07, 2021NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: June 09, 2022APPELLATE RECORD
Date: April 12, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 24, 2021OBJECTION
Date: July 01, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 07, 2022MOTION - MEDIATION
Date: May 18, 2021COA - POST CARD
Date: April 13, 2021MOTION - COMPEL
Date: July 06, 2021COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: April 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER AMENDED ORDER GRANTING (PL) MSJ & DENYING (DF) MSJ AND FNL JUDGMENT ORDER - VACATE (POST JUDG MOTION) (OCA and REOPEN CASE) JANUARY 19, 2021 ORDER |
|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR O/AMEND O/S/J TO JUDGE'S QUEUE |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
JOINT MTN TO AMEND SJ ORDER & ENTER FNL JUDGMENT MOTION - MODIFY FINAL ORDER JOINT MOTION TO AMEND THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER AND FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER AMENDED ORDER GRANTING (PL) MSJ & DENYING (DF) MSJ AND FNL JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER - MEDIATION | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR O/MEDIATION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES & MEDIATOR |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINITFF SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION COMPEL,MTN SET TRIAL DATE, REQUEST ATTORNEY,S FEES, EXPENSES & COSTS MOTION - COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL/MEDIATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO SET A TRIAL DATE ON PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, EXPENSES, AND COSTS |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - Compel MEDIATION |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT OPPOSITION TO PLAINITFF MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION OBJECTION DEFENDANT /TO PLAINTIFF MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.