Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Merwin, Betty, Merwin, Lee, Rushing, Janice, Rushing, Lige, Jr, filed a(n) Property case represented by Frisch, Robert K, Miller, Robert Allen, Minter, Darrell D, against Merwin, Betty, Merwin, Lee, Rushing, Janice, Rushing, Lige, Jr., represented by Frisch, Robert K, Garelick, Scott M, Miller, Robert Allen, Minter, Darrell D, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with SMITH, CRAIG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMITH, CRAIG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 09, 2018 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 22, 2019MOTION - REALIGN
Date: March 03, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 08, 2019NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 25, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 20, 2020ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: March 31, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 11, 2019CASE NOT SETTLED AT MEDIATION
Date: December 02, 2019BRIEF FILED
Date: March 20, 2019RESPONSE
Date: March 15, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 08, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 11, 2019OBJECTION
Date: September 16, 2019MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: November 08, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 09, 2019Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: March 22, 2019ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: March 27, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 22, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 20, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 22, 2019MOTION - MODIFY FINAL ORDER
Date: April 18, 2019ORDER - PRETRIAL
Date: September 12, 2018CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: July 09, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 09, 2018NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 25, 2019BRIEF FILED
Date: March 20, 2019RESPONSE
Date: March 15, 2019COUNTER CLAIM
Date: March 22, 2019Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: March 22, 2019MOTION - MODIFY FINAL ORDER
Date: April 18, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 22, 2019MOTION - REALIGN
Date: March 03, 2020EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 19, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 20, 2020CASE NOT SETTLED AT MEDIATION
Date: December 02, 2019FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: September 16, 2020WITNESS LIST
Date: March 19, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 20, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 20, 2020RULE 11
Date: March 12, 2020MOTION - NEW TRIAL
Date: June 03, 2019RESPONSE
Date: August 14, 2019MOTION - JUDGMENT
Date: July 30, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 22, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM - COUNTER PETITION
Date: June 03, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 23, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 22, 2019MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 30, 2019OBJECTION
Date: October 21, 2020MOTION HEARING
Date: September 23, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2019MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 11, 2019OBJECTION
Date: September 13, 2019Non Jury Trial
Date: August 19, 2019OBJECTION
Date: November 01, 2019JURY DEMAND
Date: October 14, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 16, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 09, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 03, 2019OBJECTION
Date: September 16, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 08, 2020WITNESS LIST
Date: September 21, 2020WITNESS LIST
Date: September 16, 2020FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: September 21, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 08, 2020ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: March 31, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 08, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 08, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 08, 2020REQUEST CLERK PREPARE RECORD
Date: January 22, 2021FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: November 19, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL - CT. OF APPEALS
Date: January 22, 2021REQUEST FOR FINDING OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: November 16, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 08, 2018ORDER - PRETRIAL
Date: September 12, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: January 16, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 07, 2019ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: March 27, 2019BRIEF FILED
Date: October 12, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 09, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 20, 2020Non Jury Trial
Date: October 13, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 22, 2019ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: October 13, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 22, 2019NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: October 14, 2020ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: November 12, 2019MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: November 08, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 08, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 11, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 11, 2019FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: December 01, 2020NOTE - CLERKS
Date: January 26, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 08, 2020BRIEF FILED
Date: October 12, 2020COA - POST CARD
Date: January 30, 2021CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE
Date: February 01, 2021DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: October 21, 2020FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: December 02, 2020FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: December 07, 2020REQUEST REPORTER RECORD
Date: January 22, 2021APPELLATE RECORD
Date: February 25, 2021OPINION
Date: May 26, 2022COA - POST CARD
Date: February 26, 2021COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: May 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
OPINION - & 5TH COA ORDER (AFFIRMED) |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER - OPINION ISSUED |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
COA - POST CARD -05-21-00062-CV COA - POST CARD 05-21-00062-CV |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
APPELLATE RECORD COA CASE NO 05-21-00062-CV, SUBMITTED PAID CLERK'S RECORD TO THE 5TH COA W/CONF TRACE PG 42643 |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE COA CASE NO 05-21-00062-CV, PREPARED CLERK'S RECORD FOR CASE ON APPEAL BILLED ($421.00 - 396 PAGES) |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COA CASE NO 05-21-00062-CV, PREPARING CLERK'S RECORD FOR CASE ON APPEAL |
|
January 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
COA - POST CARD - 05-21-00062-CV COA - POST CARD 05-21-00062-CV |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR REPORTER RECORD NOTE - CLERKS REQUEST FOR REPORTER'S RECORD HAND DELIVERED AND E-MAILED TO COURT REPORTER |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CLERKS RECORD REQUEST CLERK PREPARE RECORD PLAINTIFFS REQUEST CLERK PREPARE RECORD |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEAL - CT. OF APPEALS PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF APPEAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.