Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Reiss, David, Spy Games, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Boisvert, Carter, Leonard, Ernest Walter, Ticer, Mark A, against Hanson, Jason R., represented by Harlow, Todd J, Smith, Sara M, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 191st District Court with SLAUGHTER, GENA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2018 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House191st District Court |
ORDER - MISC.
Date: February 26, 2018SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: March 07, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 23, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 29, 2018ORDER - EXTEND TRO
Date: March 09, 2018RESPONSE
Date: March 28, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 28, 2018MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: March 23, 2018ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (PREJUDGMENT) (OCA)
Date: April 17, 2018SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: March 21, 2018MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: March 28, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 16, 2018MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: April 10, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: February 21, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 11, 2018MOTION - COMPEL
Date: May 11, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 10, 2018RESPONSE
Date: March 26, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 14, 2018MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: March 23, 2018MOTION - SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 26, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 29, 2018Temporary Injunction
Date: March 28, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 27, 2018ORDER - MISC.
Date: July 13, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 27, 2018RESPONSE
Date: June 19, 2018ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (POST JUDGMENT)
Date: May 15, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 08, 2018MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: July 18, 2018MOTION HEARING
Date: June 22, 2018ORDER - SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: June 22, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 03, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 20, 2018MOTION HEARING
Date: August 17, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 10, 2018MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 03, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 03, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 26, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 20, 2018ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (PREJUDGMENT) (OCA)
Date: August 30, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 19, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL - CT. OF APPEALS
Date: August 10, 2018MOTION - NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: August 27, 2018ORDER - DENY
Date: August 07, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 19, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 19, 2018SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 17, 2018RESPONSE
Date: August 14, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 27, 2018ORDER - PROTECT
Date: September 19, 2018ORDER - MISC.
Date: November 16, 2018RULE 11
Date: October 12, 2018MOTION - PROTECT
Date: November 16, 2018MOTION - PROTECT
Date: August 27, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 08, 2018MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 03, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 03, 2018ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: October 10, 2018AMENDED PETITION
Date: December 03, 2018COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: August 27, 2018MOTION - JUDGMENT
Date: September 28, 2018MOTION HEARING
Date: October 11, 2018MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: December 20, 2018ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: December 03, 2018MOTION - COMPEL
Date: February 21, 2019RULE 11
Date: November 09, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 27, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL OF AJ
Date: December 27, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL OF AJ
Date: September 21, 2018MOTION - COMPEL
Date: December 03, 2018MOTION - PROTECT
Date: January 28, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 20, 2018Motion - Compel
Date: March 01, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 19, 2018ORDER - NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: September 28, 2018MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 11, 2019AMENDED PETITION
Date: November 16, 2018MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: November 14, 2018Appeal of Associate Judge Ruling
Date: November 16, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 27, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 27, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 17, 2019RESPONSE
Date: January 29, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 11, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: January 15, 2019AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 18, 2019ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: February 13, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 11, 2019MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: February 15, 2019MOTION - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 08, 2019RESPONSE
Date: March 19, 2019MOTION - STRIKE
Date: March 04, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 27, 2019MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: May 16, 2019COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: April 26, 2019MOTION - PROTECT
Date: March 28, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 27, 2019RESPONSE
Date: April 30, 2019ORDER - EXTEND TRO
Date: May 16, 2019Motion - Partial Summary Judgment
Date: March 26, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 01, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 13, 2019MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: April 29, 2019ORDER - EXTEND TRO
Date: May 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 01, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 14, 2019ORDER - MISC.
Date: May 02, 2019MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: May 01, 2019ORDER - MISC.
Date: June 07, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 17, 2019MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: June 10, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 03, 2019ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (POST JUDGMENT)
Date: May 08, 2019ORDER - DENY
Date: June 07, 2019RESPONSE
Date: May 28, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 16, 2019ORDER - EXTEND TRO
Date: May 24, 2019RESPONSE
Date: June 17, 2019MOTION - RELEASE FUNDS
Date: July 01, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 19, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 24, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 19, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 05, 2019MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: June 28, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 23, 2019ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (POST JUDGMENT)
Date: September 03, 2019RESPONSE
Date: September 06, 2019ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (POST JUDGMENT)
Date: July 30, 2019RESPONSE
Date: September 06, 2019MOTION HEARING
Date: July 19, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 22, 2019MOTION HEARING
Date: August 07, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 23, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 16, 2019MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: September 06, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 01, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 01, 2019MOTION HEARING
Date: June 20, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 27, 2019RESPONSE
Date: July 01, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 06, 2019ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (POST JUDGMENT)
Date: July 01, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: December 10, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 16, 2019RESPONSE
Date: January 16, 2020MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: July 01, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 22, 2019RESPONSE
Date: January 14, 2020COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: July 08, 2019RESPONSE
Date: September 06, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 16, 2019MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: August 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 12, 2019ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: September 09, 2019MOTION - PROTECT
Date: April 09, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 16, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 16, 2019RESPONSE
Date: October 16, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 16, 2019BRIEF FILED
Date: May 13, 2020Jury Trial - Civil
Date: November 09, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 16, 2019Motion - Exclude
Date: October 18, 2019Motion - Strike
Date: January 17, 2020Pre-Trial Hearing
Date: January 17, 2020BRIEF FILED
Date: May 11, 2020CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: February 21, 2018MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 23, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 23, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 23, 2018ORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: February 26, 2018ORDER - MISC.
Date: February 26, 2018MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: March 23, 2018TRO ISSUED
Date: March 01, 2018ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (PREJUDGMENT) (OCA)
Date: April 17, 2018REGISTRY DEPOSIT RECEIPT
Date: February 28, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL OF AJ
Date: September 21, 2018MOTION - JUDGMENT
Date: September 28, 2018CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE
Date: September 27, 2018ORDER - NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: September 28, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 15, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 15, 2018Appeal of Associate Judge Ruling
Date: November 16, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 20, 2018AMENDED PETITION
Date: November 16, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 20, 2018ORDER - MISC.
Date: November 16, 2018MOTION - PROTECT
Date: November 16, 2018APPELLATE RECORD
Date: August 28, 2018CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE
Date: October 01, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 20, 2018NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: December 05, 2018MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: December 20, 2018NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT
Date: December 05, 2018ORDER - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION
Date: December 21, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 27, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 04, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 11, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 20, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 03, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL OF AJ
Date: December 27, 2018MOTION - COMPEL
Date: February 11, 2019Motion - Compel
Date: March 01, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 11, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 14, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: January 15, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 29, 2019MOTION - PROTECT
Date: January 28, 2019MOTION - STRIKE
Date: March 04, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 04, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 11, 2019RESPONSE
Date: January 29, 2019ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: February 13, 2019RESPONSE
Date: April 30, 2019SUPPLEMENTAL CLERK'S RECORD REQUEST
Date: September 28, 2018APPELLATE RECORD
Date: September 28, 2018COA - POST CARD
Date: October 05, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 08, 2018ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: October 10, 2018MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: November 14, 2018RESPONSE
Date: November 15, 2018MOTION HEARING
Date: November 28, 2018RULE 11
Date: November 09, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 29, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 29, 2018AMENDED PETITION
Date: December 03, 2018ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: December 03, 2018MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: March 22, 2019RESPONSE
Date: March 19, 2019MOTION - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 08, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 22, 2019SUPPLEMENTAL CLERK'S RECORD REQUEST
Date: March 19, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 22, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 19, 2019SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE
Date: March 20, 2019ISSUE NOTICE
Date: May 02, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 01, 2019ORDER - MISC.
Date: May 02, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 01, 2019TRO HEARING
Date: May 02, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 01, 2019MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: May 01, 2019ISSUE TRO
Date: May 02, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 17, 2019ORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: May 02, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: December 03, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 02, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 22, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 17, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 06, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 03, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 06, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 03, 2019TRUST RECEIPT
Date: May 02, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: February 21, 2019MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: February 15, 2019AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 18, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 26, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 06, 2019ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (POST JUDGMENT)
Date: May 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 13, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: June 21, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 01, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 14, 2019RESPONSE
Date: July 01, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 01, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 01, 2019TRO HEARING
Date: May 15, 2019MOTION - RELEASE FUNDS
Date: July 01, 2019Motion - Partial Summary Judgment
Date: March 26, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: April 12, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 27, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 27, 2019RESPONSE
Date: March 26, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 30, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 27, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 27, 2019ORDER - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION
Date: June 11, 2019ORDER - MISC.
Date: June 07, 2019MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: June 10, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 05, 2019ORDER - DENY
Date: June 07, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 17, 2019REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: June 12, 2019RESPONSE
Date: June 17, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 12, 2019ISSUE CITATION
Date: June 12, 2019TRUST RECEIPT
Date: June 12, 2019MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: June 28, 2019MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: July 01, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 05, 2019MANDATE REVERSE
Date: July 08, 2019COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: July 08, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: July 12, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 08, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 17, 2019RESPONSE
Date: October 16, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 06, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 17, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 26, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 24, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 28, 2019RESPONSE
Date: May 28, 2019JURY DEMAND
Date: May 20, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 24, 2019MOTION HEARING
Date: May 29, 2019COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: April 26, 2019ORDER - EXTEND TRO
Date: May 24, 2019ORDER - EXTEND TRO
Date: May 29, 2019MOTION - PROTECT
Date: March 28, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 29, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 26, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 08, 2019MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: April 29, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 30, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 26, 2019MOTION HEARING
Date: July 19, 2019MOTION HEARING
Date: August 07, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 23, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 27, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 30, 2019ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (POST JUDGMENT)
Date: September 03, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 16, 2019MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: May 16, 2019ORDER - EXTEND TRO
Date: May 16, 2019MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: May 16, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 16, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 17, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 17, 2019MOTION HEARING
Date: June 20, 2019MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: August 29, 2019RESPONSE
Date: January 16, 2020RESPONSE
Date: January 16, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 14, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 24, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2019ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (POST JUDGMENT)
Date: July 01, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 19, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 19, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 22, 2019Motion - Exclude
Date: January 17, 2020RESPONSE
Date: June 23, 2020MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 03, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 06, 2019MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: September 06, 2019RESPONSE
Date: September 06, 2019RESPONSE
Date: September 06, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 10, 2019RESPONSE
Date: September 06, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 09, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 12, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 16, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 16, 2019RESPONSE
Date: September 12, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 26, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 16, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 16, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 22, 2019MOTION - LEAVE
Date: July 30, 2019ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: September 09, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 12, 2019ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (POST JUDGMENT)
Date: July 30, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 23, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: December 10, 2019MOTION - STRIKE
Date: December 13, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 12, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 09, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM - COUNTER PETITION
Date: December 10, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 05, 2019RESPONSE
Date: January 14, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 16, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 14, 2020Motion - Compel
Date: January 17, 2020PRE-TRIAL HEARING
Date: January 17, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 16, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 16, 2019Motion - Exclude
Date: October 18, 2019BRIEF FILED
Date: June 02, 2020MOTION - STRIKE
Date: June 02, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 10, 2020Motion - Strike
Date: July 01, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 26, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 09, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 10, 2020RESPONSE
Date: September 15, 2020BRIEF FILED
Date: May 11, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 30, 2021Motion - Strike
Date: January 17, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 21, 2020Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 10, 2020MOTION - PROTECT
Date: April 09, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 01, 2020Motion - Protect
Date: May 08, 2020BRIEF FILED
Date: May 13, 2020MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: October 13, 2020MOTION - WITHDRAW MISC
Date: June 01, 20205TH COA ORDER
Date: October 16, 2020COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: October 16, 2020COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: October 16, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 29, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 29, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2020OPINION
Date: October 16, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 13, 2020ORDER - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 30, 2020ORDER - COMPEL
Date: October 30, 2020ORDER - DENY
Date: October 30, 2020Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: December 10, 2020OBJECTION
Date: August 11, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 19, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 06, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: November 16, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 30, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 11, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 30, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 30, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 16, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: December 17, 2021ORDER - MISC.
Date: October 30, 2020ORDER - MISC.
Date: October 30, 2020ORDER - MISC.
Date: October 30, 2020MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 24, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 24, 2022RESPONSE
Date: August 05, 2021RESPONSE
Date: December 17, 2021OPINION
Date: February 21, 2022RESPONSE
Date: December 16, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 23, 20225TH COA ORDER
Date: February 21, 2022MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: October 19, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 12, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: August 12, 2021ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (PREJUDGMENT) (OCA)
Date: October 21, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 19, 2021MOTION - MODIFY FINAL ORDER
Date: January 26, 2022MOTION - STRIKE
Date: February 23, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 07, 2022COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: February 21, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: February 25, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: November 16, 2021RESPONSE
Date: April 28, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 18, 2021ORDER - MISC.
Date: June 24, 2022ORDER - MISC.
Date: June 24, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 05, 2022ORDER - DENY
Date: June 24, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 05, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 24, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: March 01, 2022Motion - Strike
Date: April 19, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 08, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 15, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 09, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 08, 2022RESPONSE
Date: April 28, 2022MOTION HEARING
Date: May 03, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 05, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 10, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 05, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 05, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 09, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 09, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 05, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 05, 2022ORDER - MISC.
Date: June 24, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: June 27, 2022MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: November 22, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 10, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 21, 2022COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: June 23, 2022COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: June 23, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 20, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 24, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: May 30, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 23, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 30, 2023MOTION HEARING
Date: September 22, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: March 20, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: August 10, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 18, 2023MOTION HEARING
Date: April 27, 2023OPINION
Date: June 23, 2022ORDER - MISC.
Date: June 24, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 23, 2022MOTION - SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 22, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: February 12, 2024NOTICE ISSUED
Date: March 01, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 24, 2018INTERVENTION
Date: April 18, 2018Temporary Injunction
Date: March 28, 2018MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: March 23, 2018RESPONSE
Date: March 26, 2018MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: March 28, 2018RESPONSE
Date: March 28, 2018MOTION - EXTEND
Date: March 09, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 28, 2018ORDER - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION
Date: March 28, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 29, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: February 21, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 23, 2018CITATION ISSUED
Date: March 01, 2018SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: March 07, 2018MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: May 09, 2018RESPONSE
Date: May 10, 2018MOTION - DISSOLVE
Date: May 10, 2018COUNTER CLAIM
Date: May 09, 2018ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (POST JUDGMENT)
Date: May 15, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 29, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 22, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 21, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 10, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 11, 2018DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: May 02, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 11, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 06, 2018MOTION - COMPEL
Date: May 11, 2018MOTION HEARING
Date: June 22, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 09, 2018ORDER - EXTEND TRO
Date: March 09, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 09, 2018MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: April 10, 2018MOTION HEARING
Date: June 08, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 16, 2018SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: March 21, 2018MOTION - MODIFY MISC
Date: May 02, 2018RESPONSE
Date: June 19, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 03, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 14, 2018MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: July 18, 2018SUPPLEMENTAL CLERK'S RECORD REQUEST
Date: August 17, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 26, 2018MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 03, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 03, 2018ORDER - SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: June 22, 2018MOTION HEARING
Date: August 17, 2018MOTION - MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDER
Date: August 07, 2018MOTION - SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 26, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 27, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 08, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 10, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 26, 2018REQUEST CLERK PREPARE RECORD
Date: August 13, 2018ORDER - DENY
Date: August 07, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 07, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL - CT. OF APPEALS
Date: August 10, 2018REQUEST REPORTER RECORD
Date: August 13, 2018RESPONSE
Date: June 19, 2018RESPONSE
Date: June 19, 2018RESPONSE
Date: August 14, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 06, 2018MOTION - QUASH
Date: July 12, 2018RESPONSE
Date: August 14, 2018ORDER - MISC.
Date: July 13, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 03, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 14, 2018COA - POST CARD
Date: August 23, 2018CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE
Date: August 22, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 20, 2018REQUEST REPORTER RECORD
Date: August 17, 2018APPELLATE RECORD
Date: August 28, 2018APPELLATE RECORD
Date: August 20, 2018ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (PREJUDGMENT) (OCA)
Date: August 30, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 20, 2018ORDER - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION
Date: August 28, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2018REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2018COA - POST CARD
Date: August 30, 2018CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: August 31, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 30, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 19, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 19, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 19, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 19, 2018ORDER - PROTECT
Date: September 19, 2018COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: August 27, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 03, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 03, 2018MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 03, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 27, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 03, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 03, 2018MOTION HEARING
Date: October 11, 2018MOTION - MODIFY MISC
Date: November 07, 2018APPELLATE RECORD
Date: October 04, 2018RULE 11
Date: October 12, 2018AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM - AMENDED COUNTER-PETITION
Date: October 17, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 26, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 25, 2018MOTION - PROTECT
Date: August 27, 2018SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 17, 2018MOTION - NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: August 27, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 27, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 06, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 24, 2018SUPPLEMENTAL CLERK'S RECORD REQUEST
Date: September 20, 2018ISSUE NOTICE
Date: August 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
191st JURY TRIAL LETTER Jury Trial - Civil *SPECIAL SETTING - 4-5 DAYS - 40 PANEL |
|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION HEARING **IN PERSON- SHOW CAUSE |
|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING - DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR RULE 166 CONFERENCE MOTION HEARING 1HR * DEF'S RULE 166 CONFERENCE * ANGELE ORTIZ 214 580 5823 * VIA ZOOM |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING - DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR RULE 166 CONFERENCE NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR RULE 166 CONFERENCE |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RULE 166 CONFERENCE MOTION - MISCELLANOUS MOTION FOR RULE 166 CONFERENCE |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED ORDER RULE 166 CONFERENCE |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE MISCELLANOUS EVENT NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION HEARING SHOW CAUSE |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COURTESY COPY BINDER DELIVERED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.