Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Khademazad, Behrooz, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Siegel, William L, against Gharavi, Sean, represented by Baker, Timothy E, Bloom, Jason P, Knight, Christopher, Paulsen, Allen Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 11, 2018AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 18, 2019MOTION - STRIKE
Date: March 21, 2019RESPONSE
Date: March 22, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 11, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 25, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 11, 2018ORDER - MISC.
Date: June 19, 2018ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: June 05, 2019DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 30, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 12, 2018RESPONSE
Date: September 21, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 10, 2019RESPONSE
Date: March 21, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 16, 2019RESPONSE
Date: December 11, 2019ORDER - DENY
Date: January 22, 2019MOTION - DISMISS
Date: October 11, 2018BRIEF FILED
Date: October 04, 2019RESPONSE
Date: March 18, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 12, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 24, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 24, 2019MOTION - STRIKE
Date: March 18, 2019RESPONSE
Date: November 08, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 19, 2019NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 12, 2019ORDER - DENY
Date: April 26, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL - CT. OF APPEALS
Date: January 21, 2020ORDER - DENY CONTINUANCE
Date: October 01, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 25, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 05, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 24, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 05, 2019MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 11, 2019NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: October 23, 2019MOTION - NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: February 17, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 22, 2019DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 24, 2018REQUEST FOR FINDING OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: November 11, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 16, 2019Motion - New Trial
Date: January 27, 2020REQUEST FOR FINDING OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: October 24, 2019Motion - New Trial
Date: January 07, 2020Motion - New Trial
Date: January 06, 2020MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: April 23, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: January 08, 2018CITATION ISSUED
Date: January 10, 2018REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: June 26, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 24, 2018MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: March 16, 2018RETURNED MAIL
Date: May 03, 2018RETURNED MAIL
Date: February 26, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 16, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 25, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 11, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 21, 2018RETURNED MAIL
Date: April 02, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 25, 2018RETURNED MAIL
Date: August 10, 2018RESPONSE
Date: September 21, 2018ORDER - DENY
Date: January 22, 2019RESPONSE
Date: November 08, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 11, 2018DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 24, 2018AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 18, 2019MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 11, 2019RESPONSE
Date: March 18, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 12, 2019NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 12, 2019MOTION - STRIKE
Date: March 18, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 11, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 19, 2019ORDER - DENY CONTINUANCE
Date: October 01, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 16, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 24, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 16, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 05, 2019RETURNED MAIL
Date: January 24, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 12, 2018MOTION - DISMISS
Date: October 11, 2018MOTION - STRIKE
Date: March 21, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2018RESPONSE
Date: March 21, 2019ORDER - MISC.
Date: June 19, 2018RESPONSE
Date: March 22, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 24, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 25, 2019SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: August 24, 2018DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 30, 2018MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 05, 2019BRIEF FILED
Date: October 04, 2019MOTION - WITHDRAW MISC
Date: August 29, 2019REQUEST FOR FINDING OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: October 30, 2019Special Setting
Date: October 08, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 04, 2019ORDER - DENY
Date: April 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 04, 2019ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: June 05, 2019MOTION - NEW TRIAL
Date: November 22, 2019MOTION - MODIFY FINAL ORDER
Date: November 22, 2019MOTION - NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: November 22, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 02, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 02, 2020REQUEST CLERK PREPARE RECORD
Date: January 21, 2020Motion - New Trial
Date: January 07, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL - CT. OF APPEALS
Date: January 21, 2020REQUEST REPORTER RECORD
Date: January 21, 2020RESPONSE
Date: September 19, 2019FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: October 31, 2019NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: October 23, 2019DEPUTY REPORTER STATEMENT
Date: October 08, 2019REQUEST FOR FINDING OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: October 24, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 10, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 11, 2019REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2020APPELLATE RECORD
Date: February 18, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 26, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 11, 2019RESPONSE
Date: December 11, 2019REQUEST FOR FINDING OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: November 11, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 22, 2019Motion - New Trial
Date: January 06, 2020CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE
Date: April 02, 2020COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: June 15, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 16, 2019COA - POST CARD
Date: February 19, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL CLERK'S RECORD REQUEST
Date: April 01, 2020APPELLATE RECORD
Date: April 16, 2020MANDATE REVERSE
Date: June 15, 2021COA - POST CARD
Date: April 17, 2020Motion - New Trial
Date: January 27, 2020DEPUTY REPORTER STATEMENT
Date: January 27, 2020CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE
Date: January 31, 2020MOTION - NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: February 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER 05-20-00083-CV |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
MANDATE REVERSE 05-20-00083-CV |
|
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
COA - POST CARD 05-20-00083CV |
|
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
COA - POST CARD 05-20-00083CV |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
SUPP #1 APPELLATE RECORD APPELLATE RECORD COA CASE NO 05-20-00083-CV, SENT SUPP #1 CLERK'S RECORD TO THE 5TH COA W/CONF TRACE PAGE NO 40215 |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
APPELLATE RECORD COA CASE NO 05-20-00083-CV, SENT SUPP #1 CLERK'S RECORD TO THE 5TH COA W/CONF TRACE PAGE NO 40215 |
|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
SUPP #1 CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE COA CASE NO 05-20-00083-CV, PREPARED REQUESTED SUPP #1 CLERK'S RECORD, BILLED ATTY ($58.00 - 33 PAGES) |
|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COA CASE 05-20-00083-CV, PREPARING REQUESTED SUPP #1 CLERK'S RECORD |
|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE COA CASE NO 05-20-00083-CV, PREPARED REQUESTED SUPP #1 CLERK'S RECORD, BILLED ATTY ($58.00 - 33 PAGES) |
|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COA CASE 05-20-00083-CV, PREPARING REQUESTED SUPP #1 CLERK'S RECORD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.