Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gibson, Krystal N., Muse, Terion D., Washington, De'Royce D., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alvarez, Robert, Lavery, Brandon, against Garcia, Javier, Hanson Pipe & Precast Llc, represented by Madden, Daniel J, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2014 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 11, 2014ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 12, 2014MOTION - DISMISS
Date: February 08, 2016ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 29, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 11, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
2016_02_08 Motion to Dismiss - Final MOTION - DISMISS AGREED W/PREJUDICE |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/DISMISS SUBMITTED |
|
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT MEDICAL RECORDS FOR TEXAS WALK-IN & URGENT CARE |
|
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT COST OF SERVICE FOR TEXAS WALK-IN & URGENT CARE |
|
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT COST OF SERVICE FOR TEXAS HEALTH PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL DALLAS |
|
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT COST OF SERVICE FOR MID-CITIES IMAGING |
|
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT COST OF SERVICE FOR PROCARE INJURY & REHAB CENTERS-DESOTO |
|
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT COST OF SERVICE FOR DFW PRESCRIPTIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.