Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Texas Trust Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Blalack, Chris, against Contreras, Richard Martin, Davila, Stella, Jines, Elsa, Matthews, Walter P, Perez, Emily C., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOYE', ERIC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 28, 2009ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 28, 2010MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 12, 2010SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 12, 2010REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: March 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF SERVICE - WALTER P. MATTHEWS RETURN OF SERVICE WRIT OF EXECUTION - NULLA BONA - WALTER P. MATTHEWS |
|
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXECUTION (1) 225/072 WALTER P. MATTHEWS |
|
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT JUDGMENT WALTER P. MATTHEWS |
|
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ISSUE WRIT | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ISSUE ABSTRACT | |
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT JUDGMENT | |
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUE ABSTRACT | |
September 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion - Summary Judgment P/M/SJ; FILED 5/12/10; 15MIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.