Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Green, Chris, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Gibson, David R, against Collins, Robert J, Robert J Collins Pc, represented by Collins, Robert J, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryProfessional Liability |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 09, 2010ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: February 09, 2010MOTION - REINSTATE
Date: August 23, 2010MOTION - COMPEL
Date: October 04, 2011ORDER - COMPEL
Date: October 31, 2011MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 22, 2010APPLICATION FOR TURNOVER
Date: April 25, 2013ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 01, 2010ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 28, 2009NOTICE OF APPEAL - CT. OF APPEALS
Date: June 17, 2011MOTION - NEW TRIAL
Date: April 15, 2011ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: December 02, 2010ORDER - REINSTATE (OCA and REOPEN CASE)
Date: September 13, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION - CONTEMPT OR ENFORCE TEMP ORDER MOTION HEARING SHOW CAUSE (hearing held, need order) |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR ORDER SHOW CAUSE signed 12/19, set hearing & return in SASE |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (POST JUDGMENT) | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS TO ADMIN - ORDER SHOW CAUSE |
|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE/SHOW CAUSE ORDR |
|
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION - CONTEMPT OR ENFORCE TEMP ORDER MOTION HEARING SHOW CAUSE |
|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (POST JUDGMENT) | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION - CONTEMPT OR ENFORCE TEMP ORDER MOTION - CONTEMPT |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion - Turnover ** 10 MINUTES ** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.