Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ahchu, Kattia Prado, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Hayner, William M, Jr., against Hilton Hotels Corporation, Operadora De Hoteles Loreto S De Rl De Cv, represented by Fazio, Gerard T, Parmar, Priyal, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with STANTON, JAMES M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 28, 2008MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 16, 2009ORDER - COMPEL
Date: August 27, 2009RESPONSE
Date: June 19, 2009ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 28, 2006MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 02, 2008MOTION - DISMISS
Date: July 10, 2009MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: July 08, 2009MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: August 17, 2009MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 23, 2009MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 21, 2009AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 24, 2007NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 26, 2009MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: August 03, 2009MOTION - LEAVE
Date: July 10, 2009AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 10, 2009MOTION - DISMISS
Date: November 02, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
November 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS MAILED AGRD O/DISMISS TO PLTF & DEFT'S ATTY AND O/WAS SIGNED 11-3-09 |
|
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
11-02-2009 - Motion - Dismiss CV - DC0612959 - 1364123 MOTION - DISMISS ONBASE |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING | |
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
09-28-2009 - Certificate of Deposition CV - DC0612959 - 1298932 CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION THE CAMPBELL AGENCY |
|
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS MAILED O/COMPEL TO PLTF & DEFT'S ATTY |
|
August 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
08-27-2009 - Order - Compel - DC Civ M - DC0612959 - 86 - 1262761 ORDER - COMPEL PLTF-DEPOSITION |
|
August 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion - Compel DEFT-& M/APPLY MEXICO LAW & PLTF'S M/COMPEL-DEPO-30M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.