Case Last Refreshed: 23 minutes ago
Boehler, Clay, Boehler, Tammy, Ellis, Al, Glover, Michael, Tarver, B., (total of 9) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Agosto, Benny, Kherkher, Steven Joseph, Klitsas, Loren George, Lyons, Michael Patrick, against Atmos Energy Corporation, Bobcat Contracting, Llc, Fesco, Ltd., represented by Hansen, Christopher P., Long, Sarah Holley, Pulliam, Jessica B, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with ACEVES, MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeACEVES, MARIA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This is a complaint filed in the Dallas County District Court in Texas by the surviving family members of Deric Tarver, who died in an explosion at an Atmos Energy facility in Farmersville, Texas on June 28, 2021. The plaintiffs are suing Atmos Energ...
Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 21, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 21, 2023MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 29, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 30, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 28, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 21, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 27, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2023Status Conference
Date: July 28, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2023Status Conference
Date: June 23, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 09, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 14, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 14, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 02, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 14, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 14, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 31, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 14, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 14, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 11, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 13, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: September 19, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: April 07, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: April 07, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 24, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 27, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: January 13, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 24, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 24, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 30, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: January 13, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 28, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: October 06, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 04, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 24, 2022Non Jury Trial
Date: September 12, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: September 29, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 23, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 21, 2022Status Conference
Date: September 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 19, 2022BRIEF FILED
Date: August 29, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: August 09, 2022BRIEF FILED
Date: August 30, 2022Status Conference
Date: September 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 08, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 02, 2022BRIEF FILED
Date: August 30, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 04, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 03, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: November 06, 2023RESPONSE
Date: October 30, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 27, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: October 27, 2023ORDER - LEAVE
Date: October 16, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 16, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: October 13, 2023Motion - Strike
Date: October 09, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 04, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 22, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 19, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: September 18, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 18, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 01, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 21, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 08, 2023ORDER - CONSOLIDATE
Date: May 16, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 13, 2022MOTION - CONSOLIDATE
Date: May 13, 2022INSTRUMENTS
Date: September 09, 2021INSTRUMENTS
Date: September 09, 2021Motion - Transfer
Date: September 08, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 13, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: February 12, 2024Motion - Leave
Date: November 03, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 30, 2023Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: October 30, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: October 25, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 23, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: October 18, 2023MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 16, 2023ORDER - DENY
Date: October 16, 2023Motion - Strike
Date: October 16, 2023RESPONSE
Date: October 13, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 25, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 25, 2023RESPONSE
Date: October 13, 2023RESPONSE
Date: October 13, 2023RESPONSE
Date: October 12, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 16, 2023Status Conference
Date: September 22, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 04, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 23, 2023DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: October 06, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 04, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 21, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 22, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 26, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 20, 2023RESPONSE
Date: September 20, 2023BRIEF FILED
Date: October 19, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 25, 2023ORDER - COMPEL
Date: October 19, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 22, 2023INSTRUMENTS
Date: September 09, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 20, 2023ORDER - COMPEL
Date: September 22, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: September 20, 2023MOTION - STRIKE
Date: September 18, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 19, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 21, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 19, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 21, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 28, 2023ORDER - TRANSFER
Date: September 03, 2021INSTRUMENTS
Date: September 09, 2021SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: September 18, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 25, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 15, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 18, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2023SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: September 15, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 15, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 02, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 08, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 16, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 24, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 24, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 25, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 22, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 03, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 05, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2023MOTION - QUASH
Date: October 20, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2022MOTION - LEAVE
Date: June 22, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 21, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 20, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: October 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 07, 2022OBJECTION
Date: June 15, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: June 13, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 07, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: January 17, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 05, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 09, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: July 29, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 22, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: July 22, 2022ORDER - PROTECT
Date: January 19, 2022RESPONSE
Date: September 20, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 20, 2021INSTRUMENTS
Date: September 09, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 18, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 21, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 28, 2022INSTRUMENTS
Date: September 09, 2021INSTRUMENTS
Date: September 09, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 20, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 07, 2023INSTRUMENTS
Date: September 09, 2021INSTRUMENTS
Date: September 09, 2021INSTRUMENTS
Date: September 09, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 29, 2023MOTION - PROTECT
Date: January 18, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 18, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 17, 2021MOTION - TRANSFER - NO CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: August 24, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 28, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 17, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 24, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 16, 2021INSTRUMENTS
Date: September 09, 2021INSTRUMENTS
Date: September 09, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2021DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: May 23, 2023INSTRUMENTS
Date: September 09, 2021Motion - Transfer
Date: September 02, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 04, 2022REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 16, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 04, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: March 22, 2022INSTRUMENTS
Date: September 09, 2021INSTRUMENTS
Date: September 09, 2021INSTRUMENTS
Date: September 09, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 07, 2021MOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: August 16, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 13, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 16, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 23, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 03, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 23, 2023MOTION - LEAVE
Date: June 22, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: January 30, 2023MOTION - LEAVE
Date: June 22, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: June 02, 2023Status Conference
Date: October 05, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: October 04, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 04, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: September 07, 2021MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: August 13, 2021MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: March 22, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANEOUS
Date: July 22, 2022RETURNED MAIL
Date: September 18, 2023Motion - Strike
Date: October 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESERVE FINAL JUDGMENT E-SERVED COPY OF ORDER |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL -PLTF MISCELLANOUS EVENT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER SEVER/FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED SEVER/FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - ADOLFO RUIZ CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION ADOLFO RUIZ |
|
February 19, 2024 | Docket Event | E-SERVED COPY OF ORDER | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER SEVER/ FINAL JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER SEVER/ FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL MISCELLANOUS EVENT |
|
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa Jury Trial - Civil |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.