Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Onubogu, Ifeatu, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Kaiser, Donald, against Idemili Foundation, Inc. Dallas Ft. Worth, Igbo Community Association Nigeria, Dfw, Inc, Ndukwe, Ben, Nwokocha, Edwin, Orafunam, Tony, (total of 5) See All represented by Akpom, Okey, Norman, Marcus D, Nwokocha, Cordelia Anakwue, Onyenah, Kenneth C, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 16, 2021 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Ifeatu Onubogu, in her capacity as Chief Financial Officer of Igbo Community Association of Nigeria, DFW, Inc. (ICAN), is suing ICAN for declaratory judgment and injunctive relief. Onubogu alleges that she discovered irregularities in ICAN's financia...
Non Jury Trial
Date: April 08, 2024Motion - Protect
Date: January 10, 2024MOTION - DISMISS
Date: November 10, 2022MOTION HEARING
Date: June 27, 2022RESPONSE
Date: January 26, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: September 19, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 10, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 16, 2021CASE NOT SETTLED AT MEDIATION
Date: August 05, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 24, 2021Motion - Dismiss
Date: February 02, 2023ORDER - DENY
Date: September 22, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM - COUNTER PETITION
Date: September 08, 2022Motion - Dismiss
Date: September 22, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: June 07, 2022ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: August 03, 2021ORDER - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 12, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: January 16, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 15, 2022Temporary Injunction
Date: September 02, 2021ORDER - TRANSFER
Date: August 10, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 26, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 03, 2024MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 08, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 02, 2021ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: August 06, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: May 27, 2022NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: January 30, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 16, 2021Non Jury Trial
Date: January 22, 2024Motion - Quash
Date: February 24, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 22, 2024RESPONSE
Date: January 22, 2024EXHIBIT LIST
Date: September 11, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: September 11, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: September 07, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 05, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 22, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 21, 2023SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION
Date: February 02, 2023MOTION - QUASH
Date: February 10, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 19, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 10, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 30, 2023MOTION - PROTECT
Date: January 03, 2024FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: September 05, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: January 16, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 28, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: August 23, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: September 11, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 07, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 10, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: August 03, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 24, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 24, 2023MOTION - DISMISS
Date: August 08, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 23, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: February 27, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 21, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 03, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 15, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: February 14, 2023RESPONSE
Date: September 14, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 27, 2022ORDER - DENY
Date: May 27, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 09, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 27, 2022ISSUE NOTICE
Date: May 10, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 02, 2022ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (POST JUDGMENT)
Date: June 27, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 26, 2022RESPONSE
Date: May 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 26, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 26, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 26, 2022ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (PREJUDGMENT) (OCA)
Date: April 29, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: March 25, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 19, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 16, 2022REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 25, 2022MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: April 25, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: May 04, 2022ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: March 23, 2022MOTION - RECUSE
Date: March 14, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 23, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 23, 2022MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: March 11, 2022TRUST RECEIPT
Date: September 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 05, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 19, 2021THIRD PARTY ACTION
Date: November 11, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 24, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: January 14, 2022REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2021ORDER - SHOW CAUSE (POST JUDGMENT)
Date: March 03, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: December 16, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: November 11, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: December 16, 2021MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: December 17, 2021ISSUE WRIT
Date: October 12, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 13, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 22, 2024MOTION HEARING
Date: May 27, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: January 16, 2024MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 09, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: September 14, 2022COUNTER CLAIM
Date: August 26, 2022Non Jury Trial
Date: October 10, 2022Non Jury Trial
Date: September 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
NON JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE Non Jury Trial (3 days) |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Non Jury Trial CARRIED FROM 1-22-2024 (3 days) |
|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion - Continuance SET BY JUDGE. VIA PHONE |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
NON JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE Non Jury Trial (Level 2) 3 DAYS |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO EMERGENCY MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL. RESPONSE TO EMERGENCY MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
EMERGENCY MOTION TO CONTINUE MOTION - CONTINUANCE EMERGENCY |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS CC REC'D FOR 1/22 TRIAL |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TRIAL SUB-B NDUKWE MISCELLANOUS EVENT |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TRIAL SUB-T OFARUNAM MISCELLANOUS EVENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.