Case Last Refreshed: 7 hours ago
Winter, Simi, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ananti, Blessing O., against Kangha, John, Tabe, Kevin, Tabe Petroleum Corporation, Tabe, Theresia, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePURDY, MONICA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2020 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This is a complaint about an antitrust violation regarding petroleum products in Dallas County, Texas. Plaintiff SIMI Winter is a retailer of petroleum products operated by Winter Family Trust and sued for dissolution of a conspiracy and monopolizati...
ORDER - REINSTATE (OCA and REOPEN CASE)
Date: October 06, 2021Motion - Reinstate
Date: October 06, 2021NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: May 20, 2021MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: May 19, 2021NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: April 22, 2021NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: December 11, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: March 03, 2021NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: November 30, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: August 19, 2021NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: March 22, 2021NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: July 22, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 06, 2022MOTION - SET ASIDE
Date: January 06, 2022DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: December 30, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: October 15, 2020NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: December 15, 2020RESPONSE
Date: January 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 11, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 04, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: August 19, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 20, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 24, 2022NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: June 29, 2021MOTION - REINSTATE
Date: September 17, 2021MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: November 02, 2021NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: June 03, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 02, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 18, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 18, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 10, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: March 03, 2021NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: December 15, 2020NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: February 02, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: October 15, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 15, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 18, 2021NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: December 11, 2020MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: June 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGEMENT RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S - IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGEMENT |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE TO KEVIN TABE/ BILLING NOTICE FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION - SET ASIDE | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
dwop hearing notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION HEARING Submission - Default Judgment |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Dismissal re-set. E-mailed counsel. |
|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF DAMAGES AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.