Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Adkins, Allen Lee, against Carpio, Victor, represented by Teter, William Ross, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with SMITH, CRAIG presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2009 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This is a legal complaint filed in Texas by Citibank (South Dakota), N.A against Victor Carpio, regarding Carpio's credit account. The nature of the complaint is breach of contract and account stated. Citibank alleges that Carpio entered into an agre...
MOTION - COMPEL
Date: June 17, 2010ORDER - PRETRIAL
Date: December 09, 2010ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 02, 2010ORDER - COMPEL
Date: October 04, 2010DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: December 20, 2010DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: February 03, 2010MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 07, 2011MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 26, 2010ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 11, 2009MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 13, 2009MOTION - LEAVE
Date: February 15, 2010ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: April 03, 2009DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: June 04, 2009MOTION - LEAVE
Date: February 25, 2010CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 09, 2011CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 17, 2010MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 27, 2010CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 08, 2010MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 24, 2010CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 21, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION judgmt due |
|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COPY TO P & D |
|
March 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS TO ADM O/JUDGMT |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
3-9-2011 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC0903940 - 3526802 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
03-07-2011 - Motion - In Limine CV - DC0903940 - 3506913 MOTION - IN LIMINE |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil attys waived jury; bench trial held |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
02-18-2011 - Special Exceptions - DC Civ P - DC0903940 - 3374849 SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS |
|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-20-2010 - Designation of Expert Witness(es) CV - DC0903940 - 3011510 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES) |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-17-2010 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC0903940 - 3027454 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: COPY OF PRE TRIAL ORDER |
|
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-09-2010 - Order - Pretrial - DC Civ M - DC0903940 - 937 - 2951169 ORDER - PRETRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.