Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Aguilar, Lorena, Aguilar, Nestor, Dora Mendieta, Individually, And As Next Friend Of J.L. Iii And As Legal Representative Of The Estate Of Jorge Loredo, Jane Mary Loredo, Individually As Surviving Mother Of Jorge Loredo, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Bell, James J., Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, Llc, Maritime Chemists Services Of The Coastal Bend Of Texas, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Cameron County, TX, . Cameron County, TX Superior Courts with Sanchez, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2019 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCameron County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Original Answer
Date: September 06, 2019Motion
Date: May 06, 2020Motion
Date: May 04, 2020Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: April 16, 2020Intervention
Date: April 07, 2020Motion
Date: May 15, 2020Original Answer
Date: March 19, 2020Exhibits
Date: May 15, 2020Answer
Date: May 22, 2020Order
Date: May 26, 2020E-Filed Order
Date: May 26, 2020Original Answer
Date: December 04, 2020E-Filed Order
Date: December 09, 2020Exhibits
Date: July 01, 2020Motion
Date: July 01, 2020Exhibits
Date: July 01, 2020E-Filed Order
Date: July 01, 2020Original Answer
Date: September 09, 2019Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: August 26, 2019Original Answer
Date: August 08, 2019Rule 11 Agreement
Date: June 02, 2020Response
Date: August 04, 2020Order
Date: September 28, 2020Exhibits
Date: August 07, 2020E-Filed Order
Date: June 01, 2020Motion
Date: June 24, 2020Motion
Date: June 04, 2020Exhibits
Date: October 02, 2020Amended Petition
Date: October 16, 2020Motion
Date: October 16, 2020Response
Date: October 19, 2020Motion
Date: October 23, 2020E-Filed Order
Date: October 16, 2020Motion
Date: June 23, 2020Motion
Date: May 15, 2020Motion
Date: May 11, 2020Exhibits
Date: May 11, 2020Notice
Date: January 22, 2021Rule 11 Agreement
Date: June 22, 2020Exhibits
Date: June 24, 2020Exhibits
Date: January 22, 2021Exhibits
Date: July 01, 2020Notice
Date: January 22, 2021Exhibits
Date: June 24, 2020Notice
Date: January 22, 2021Exhibits
Date: July 01, 2020Motion
Date: August 07, 2020Motion
Date: September 08, 2020Motion
Date: January 29, 2021E-Filed Order
Date: January 29, 2021Exhibits
Date: October 23, 2020Motion
Date: February 22, 2021Response
Date: January 26, 2021Reply
Date: April 19, 2021Exhibits
Date: January 29, 2021Amended Original Answer
Date: March 19, 2021E-Filed Order
Date: April 19, 2021E-Filed Order
Date: May 11, 2021Response
Date: March 19, 2021Motion
Date: May 11, 2021E-Filed Order
Date: May 11, 2021Motion
Date: May 12, 2021Motion
Date: May 12, 2021E-Filed Order
Date: May 12, 2021E-Filed Order
Date: May 12, 2021Response
Date: May 13, 2021Rule 11 Agreement
Date: March 02, 2021Response
Date: March 23, 2021Motion
Date: March 23, 2021Motion
Date: April 09, 2021Objection
Date: April 05, 2021Reply
Date: April 19, 2021E-Filed Order
Date: April 20, 2021Response
Date: April 19, 2021E-Filed Order
Date: May 17, 2021Motion
Date: May 17, 2021E-Filed Order
Date: April 26, 2021Rule 11 Agreement
Date: May 14, 2021Motion
Date: May 17, 2021Motion
Date: May 21, 2021Exhibits
Date: April 19, 2021Service Return
Date: July 17, 2019No Fee Documents(Civil)
Date: June 24, 2019Citation Issued
Date: July 12, 2019Service Return
Date: August 19, 2019Notice
Date: September 13, 2019Vacation Letter
Date: March 20, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: October 18, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: March 23, 2020Notice
Date: May 12, 2020Order Setting Hearing
Date: May 21, 2020Answer
Date: May 07, 2020E-Filed Order
Date: May 04, 2020Docket Control Order
Date: June 08, 2020Exhibits
Date: June 23, 2020Exhibits
Date: May 11, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: May 26, 2020Service Return
Date: August 19, 2019Order Setting Hearing
Date: July 21, 2020Notice
Date: July 21, 2020Exhibits
Date: September 08, 2020Exhibits
Date: September 23, 2020Exhibits
Date: September 23, 2020Exhibits
Date: September 23, 2020Exhibits
Date: September 23, 2020Exhibits
Date: September 23, 2020Notice of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions
Date: June 24, 2020Cover Letter - Request
Date: July 08, 2020Order Setting Hearing
Date: July 09, 2020Order Setting Hearing
Date: July 09, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: July 09, 2020Exhibits
Date: August 07, 2020E-Filed Order
Date: August 07, 2020E-Filed Order
Date: August 25, 2023Jury Fee Paid (OCA)
Date: January 19, 2021Affidavits
Date: January 19, 2021Reporter's Certification Deposition Of:
Date: January 25, 2021Notice
Date: January 22, 2021Affidavits
Date: January 19, 2021Exhibits
Date: January 22, 2021Motion
Date: August 25, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: March 23, 2021Affidavits
Date: January 19, 2021Exhibits
Date: May 12, 2021Objection
Date: March 16, 2021Motion
Date: April 26, 2021Exhibits
Date: April 09, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 06, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 21, 2021Exhibits
Date: May 12, 2021Exhibits
Date: May 12, 2021Notice
Date: May 14, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: May 12, 2021Notice
Date: May 14, 2021Notice
Date: May 14, 2021Exhibits
Date: May 14, 2021Exhibits
Date: May 27, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 22, 2021Reporter's Certification Deposition Of:
Date: May 12, 2021Subpoena Issued
Date: May 14, 2021Exhibits
Date: May 12, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: May 18, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: May 19, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: May 24, 2023Exhibits
Date: July 30, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: May 16, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: May 16, 2021Exhibits
Date: May 14, 2021Motion
Date: May 27, 2021E-Filed Order
Date: May 27, 2021Exhibits
Date: May 27, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: May 16, 2021Exhibits
Date: May 14, 2021Notice
Date: May 14, 2021Order
Date: June 02, 2022Motion
Date: July 20, 2021Exhibits
Date: July 30, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 22, 2021Motion
Date: June 14, 2021Order
Date: September 01, 2021Correspondence from 13th Court of Appeals
Date: May 22, 2023Official Notice from the Supreme Court
Date: August 02, 2023Correspondence from 13th Court of Appeals
Date: May 22, 2023Motion
Date: July 30, 2021Exhibits
Date: January 22, 2021Affidavits
Date: January 19, 2021Exhibits
Date: January 22, 2021Reporter's Certification Deposition Of:
Date: December 07, 2020Motion
Date: March 01, 2021Notice
Date: December 04, 2020Objection
Date: March 16, 2021Exhibits
Date: January 19, 2021Affidavits
Date: January 19, 2021Affidavits
Date: January 19, 2021Affidavits
Date: January 19, 2021Reporter's Certification Deposition Of:
Date: January 25, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: March 18, 2021Affidavits
Date: January 19, 2021Affidavits
Date: January 19, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: March 18, 2021Affidavits
Date: January 19, 2021Affidavits
Date: January 19, 2021E-Filed Order
Date: December 31, 2020Amended Motion
Date: January 22, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 06, 2021Reporter's Certification Deposition Of:
Date: December 07, 2020Exhibits
Date: January 22, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: August 30, 2023Exhibits
Date: March 01, 2021Response
Date: September 11, 2023Reporter's Certification Deposition Of:
Date: February 01, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 06, 2021Rule 11 Agreement
Date: March 22, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 06, 2021Exhibits
Date: October 02, 2020Exhibits
Date: September 23, 2020Exhibits
Date: October 16, 2020E-Filed Order
Date: October 16, 2020Notice
Date: December 04, 2020Exhibits
Date: October 16, 2020Exhibits
Date: October 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing ON APPEAL Judge: Sanchez, David |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Journal Entry Tom Tijerina and Omar Saenz appeared. The Court after hearing arguments of c ounsel will wait for the Texas Supreme Court to make a ruling and will NOT SIGN the judgment submitted by Mr. Saenz. |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing ENTRY OF ORDER ON COURT APPEALS OPINION. AND ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MTN TO POSTPONE RENTITION OF JUDGMENT PENDING DECISON OF TEXAS SUPREME COURT. Judge: Sanchez, David |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Kirby's Response to Southern Recycling's Motion to Postpone Rendition of Judgment Pending Decision of Texas Supreme Court Response |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Exhibit A to Kirby's Response to Southern Recycling's Motion to Postpone Rendition of Judgment Pending Decision of Texas Supreme Court |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerks Journal Copy of Order Setting Emailed to Attorneys |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing on Southern Recycling, LLC's Motion to Postpone Rendition of Judgment Pending Decision of Texas Supreme Court Order Setting Hearing Judge: Sanchez, David |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Q) E-Filed Order |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Postpone Rendition of Judgment Pending Decision of TX Supreme Court Motion |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Journal Entry Atty's Omar Saenz & Tomas Tijerina present, Atty's to each submit their Judgment court will review and make a decision. Status on Appeal reset to 9/27/23. DSANCHEZ/mrl |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.