Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against O'Donnell, Ashley, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2022 |
CategoryCivil - Contract - Debt Collection: Credit Card |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Complaint
Date: July 27, 2022Plaintiff's Reply to New Matters
Date: September 01, 2022Receipt #000487910 for $50.00 paid for by William Callahan
Date: August 23, 2022Answer and New Matter
Date: August 24, 2022Praecipe for Appearance (First Filing by Defendant)
Date: August 23, 2022Receipt #000516026 for $17.50 paid for by Julie E Goodchild
Date: February 01, 2023Receipt #000483294 for $297.25 paid for by Julie E Goodchild
Date: July 28, 2022Praecipe for Judgment by Agreement
Date: February 01, 2023Judgment Entered for on 02-01-2023 236 Notice of Judgment Sent 02-01-2023
Date: February 01, 2023Arbitration Hearing Scheduled for 04-24-2023
Date: July 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000516026 for $17.50 paid for by Julie E Goodchild Receipt |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Praecipe for Judgment by Agreement Praecipe for Judgment |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered for on 02-01-2023 236 Notice of Judgment Sent 02-01-2023 Judgment Entered |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Reply to New Matters | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer and New Matter | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000487910 for $50.00 paid for by William Callahan Receipt |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Praecipe for Appearance (First Filing by Defendant) | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return. Ashley O'Donnell served 8/10/22 $50.10 Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Arbitration Case Initiated | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000483294 for $297.25 paid for by Julie E Goodchild Receipt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.