Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Roberts, Philip, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Green, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2022 |
CategoryCivil - Real Property - Landlord/Tenant Dispute |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Arbitration Hearing Scheduled for 03-28-2023
Date: June 30, 2022Complaint
Date: July 28, 2022Report and Award of Arbitrators; 236 Notice Sent on 03/30/2023; (ARB. PANEL)
Date: March 30, 2023Proof of Service of Notice of Appeal
Date: July 06, 2022Scheduling Order - Judge Whelan 236 Notice of Order Sent 6/2/23
Date: June 02, 2023Receipt #000478407 for $297.25 paid for by James P. McGarrity
Date: June 30, 2022Receipt #000530742 for $391.75 paid for by Melissa Green
Date: April 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Order - Judge Whelan 236 Notice of Order Sent 6/2/23 Scheduling Order |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Arbitration Appeal Mailed to Other Party | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000530742 for $391.75 paid for by Melissa Green Receipt |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Report and Award of Arbitrators; 236 Notice Sent on 03/30/2023; (ARB. PANEL) Report and Award of Arbitrators |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Notice of Appeal | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Arbitration Case Initiated | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Hearing Scheduled for 03-28-2023 Arbitration Date |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000478407 for $297.25 paid for by James P. McGarrity Receipt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.