Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Ivanenko, Liliya, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2022 |
CategoryCivil - Contract - Debt Collection: Credit Card |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Complaint
Date: June 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000518534 for $10.00 paid for by Timothy A Cirino Receipt |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Dismiss Without Prejudice | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return-LILIYA IVANENKO-SERVED ON 07/18/22-$49.80 Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000478168 for $297.25 paid for by Timothy A Cirino Receipt |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Arbitration Case Initiated | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.