Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Napoleon, Judith, Napoleon, William A, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Springfield Rehabilitation & Healthcare Center, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2022 |
CategoryCivil - Professional Liability Action - Medical |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Complaint
Date: June 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate Prerequisite to Service of Subpoena | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Stipulation to transfer case to Private Binding Arbitration. 236 Notice of Order Sent on 05/11/2023; J. Dozor Order Approving Stipulation |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate - CERTIFICATE PREREQUISITE TO SERVICE OF A SUBPOENA PURSUANT TO RULE 4009.22 Certificate |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate - CERTIFICATE PREREQUISITE TO SERVICE OF A SUBPOENA PURSUANT TO RULE 4009.22 Certificate |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000522574 for $10.00 paid for by JASON W BIALKER Receipt |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant's New Matter (E-FILED) Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant's New Matter |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment Opened 236 Notice of Judgment Sent 02-08-2023 Judgment Opened |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Petition to Open Judgment; 236 Notice of Order Sent on 02/08/2023; (J. KLEIN) Order Granting Petition to Open Judgment |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.