Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Rogers County, OK, . Rogers County, OK Superior Courts with David N. Smith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid N. Smith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationRogers County, OK |
|
AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 22, 2018GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE
Date: June 04, 2018CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 18, 2018JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: March 26, 2018CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: April 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT | |
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT SUMMONS SERVED ON 06/05/18 BY LEAVING A COPY WITH AN INDIVIDUAL AT SOLID ROCK REALTORS | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO AC09-CARD ALLOCATION | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:SC-2018-225: AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND -$0.63SC-2018-225: AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND -$0.03SC-2018-225: AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS -$0.02SC-2018-225: AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND -$0.04SC-2018-225: AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES -$0.13SC-2018-225: AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND -$0.02SC-2018-225: AC01 CLERK FEES -$2.05 | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2018-560573 ON 06/04/2018. PAYOR: VANBEBER/JONATHAN D TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 116.64. LINE ITEMS: SC-2018-225: $80.95 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2018-225: $2.92 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS. SC-2018-225: $0.64 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. SC-2018-225: $4.87 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. SC-2018-225: $1.51 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. SC-2018-225: $0.43 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. SC-2018-225: $0.95 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. SC-2018-225: $24.37 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED - MAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.