Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Pushmataha County, OK, . Pushmataha County, OK Superior Courts with Jana Kay Wallace presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPushmataha County, OK |
|
CONT TO 5-4-16 9:30
Date: April 27, 2016PRELIMINARY HEARING CONFRENCE ORDER
Date: May 04, 2016SUBPOENA SERVED 6-8-16 BILLY FREEMAN ANDCHESTER MARZEK
Date: June 08, 2016COURT RECALLS WARRANT. COURT APPOINTS OIDS
Date: April 27, 2016SUBPOENA SERVED TO MARZEK BY PCSO
Date: August 02, 2016SUBPOENA SERVED TO BILLY FREEMAN
Date: October 03, 2016DEF WAIVES PH AND ARRAINGMENT. SENTENCING 11-10-16 9:30
Date: October 05, 2016WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING
Date: October 05, 2016SUBPOENA UNSERVED TO DIANE NEESE
Date: October 04, 2016WAIVER OF THIRTY DAY ARRAIGNMENT
Date: October 05, 2016BOND: $15,000
Date: April 06, 2016DISTRICT ATTORNEY COSTS PROGRAM
Date: November 10, 2016RULES AND CONDITIONS OF SUPERVISED PROBATION
Date: November 10, 2016COST ADMINISTRATION PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT 12-10-16
Date: November 10, 2016ORDER
Date: May 15, 2017RELEASE ON BOND
Date: April 06, 2016CONT TO 10-5-16 9:30A
Date: August 03, 2016AMENDED INFORMATION
Date: August 04, 2016SUBPOENA SERVED 8-6-16 CHESTER MARZEK
Date: August 08, 2016JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE
Date: November 10, 2016PLEA OF GUILTY - SUMMARY OF FACTS
Date: November 10, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 69862 VOIDED ON 05/02/2017 BY OSCN\TINAFREEMAN. ALL ADJUSTING ENTRIES MADE ON RECEIPT # 69862 REDUCED TO $0.00 | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2017-69862 ON 05/02/2017. PAYOR: TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: CF-2016-42: $-5.54 ON TRANSFER FROM AC22 SHERIFF'S SERVICE & INCARCERATION FEE FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2017-69861 ON 05/02/2017. PAYOR: TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: CF-2016-42: $966.46 ON TRANSFER TO AC22 SHERIFF'S SERVICE & INCARCERATION FEE FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $-966.46 ON TRANSFER FROM AC35 INMATE JAIL COSTS/INCARCERATION FEE-PRIVATE FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:CF-2016-42: AC88 SHERIFF’S SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY -$0.25CF-2016-42: AC80 JAIL FUND (BOND FEE) SHERIFF OR PRIVATE JAIL -$0.63CF-2016-42: AC77 DA COUNCIL PROSECUTION ASSESSMENT FEE -$0.63CF-2016-42: AC76 MEDICAL EXPENSE LIABILITY REVOLVING FUND -$0.25CF-2016-42: AC75 FORENSIC SCIENCE IMPROVEMENT ASSESSMENTS -$0.13CF-2016-42: AC72 DA INCARCERATION FEE -$2.70CF-2016-42: AC69 CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY FEE -$0.08CF-2016-42: AC35 INMATE JAIL COSTS/INCARCERATION FEE-PRIVATE -$5.54CF-2016-42: AC07 ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT -$0.05 | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2017-69624 ON 04/19/2017. PAYOR: DIANE C NEESE TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 410.25. LINE ITEMS: CF-2016-42: $2.95 ON AC07 ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $10.26 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $215.71 ON AC35 INMATE JAIL COSTS/INCARCERATION FEE-PRIVATE FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $2.92 ON AC69 CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY FEE FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $105.30 ON AC72 DA INCARCERATION FEE FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $4.87 ON AC75 FORENSIC SCIENCE IMPROVEMENT ASSESSMENTS FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $9.75 ON AC76 MEDICAL EXPENSE LIABILITY REVOLVING FUND FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $24.37 ON AC77 DA COUNCIL PROSECUTION ASSESSMENT FEE FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $24.37 ON AC80 JAIL FUND (BOND FEE) SHERIFF OR PRIVATE JAIL FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $9.75 ON AC88 SHERIFF’S SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2017-69622 ON 04/19/2017. PAYOR: TIMOTHY NEESE TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 2,000.00. LINE ITEMS: CF-2016-42: $200.00 ON AC08 SHERIFF FEES FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $9.00 ON AC11 CLEET PENALTY ASSESSMENT FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $100.00 ON AC12 VICTIM'S COMPENSATION ASSESSMENT (VCA) FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $500.00 ON AC14 FINES FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $5.00 ON AC21 AFIS FUND FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $5.00 ON AC22 SHERIFF'S SERVICE & INCARCERATION FEE FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $120.50 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $750.75 ON AC35 INMATE JAIL COSTS/INCARCERATION FEE-PRIVATE FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $250.00 ON AC53 IDS ATTORNEY FEES - CRIMINAL ONLY FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $3.75 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $50.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO AC09-CARD ALLOCATION | |
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2017-69104 ON 03/17/2017. PAYOR: TIMOTHY NEESE TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 35.00. LINE ITEMS: CF-2016-42: $35.00 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2017-68497 ON 02/13/2017. PAYOR: TIMOTHY NEESE TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 40.00. LINE ITEMS: CF-2016-42: $13.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. CF-2016-42: $27.00 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND FOR NEESE, TIMOTHY. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.