Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Mccurtain County, OK, . Mccurtain County, OK Superior Courts with Michael D. DeBerry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMccurtain County, OK |
|
SPECIAL APPEARANCE & AGREED ORDER
Date: November 10, 2015TO FILE AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 09, 2015RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 09, 2017GARNISHMENT ORDER OF DISCHARGE
Date: May 09, 2017GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS/ISSUE
Date: October 08, 2015GARNISHMENT ANSWER
Date: November 02, 2015TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: September 09, 2015TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON JUDGMENT
Date: September 09, 2015AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: September 09, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event | RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT ORDER OF DISCHARGE | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | SPECIAL APPEARANCE & AGREED ORDER | |
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT ANSWER | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS/ISSUE OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/07 SUMMONS OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND |
|
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | TO FILE AFFIDAVIT | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON JUDGMENT | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS AND RETURN - SERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.