Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with Colleen O'Donnell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeColleen O'Donnell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
|
COMPLAINT FILED
Date: November 09, 2020DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF
Date: April 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | APPLIED - CLERKAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:28.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:6391605PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:PARKSIDE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATIO N | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT FOR FEES AND COSTSPAYEE NAME:KAMAN & CUSIMANO, LLCRPAYEE ADDRESS:8101 N HIGH STREETSUITE 370COLUMBUS, OH 43235AMT- DISB/RFND:179.00MEMO AUTH NBR:6391605 | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT COST BILLAMOUNT - PAID:300.00AMOUNT - FEES AND COSTS :121.00 | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | STRIKE SCHEDULE DATETIE FILING DATE:11/09/20DATE - COURTROOM:11/15/21TIME - COURTROOM:09:00 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4F345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215 | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | TERMINATE CASECASE NUMBER:20CV007270 SUPR CRT TERM CD:08 | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE - CERTIFIED MAILTIE FILING DATE:11/10/20DATE - SERVICE:11/17/20NAME:FRANKLIN COUNTY TREASURER | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE - CERTIFIED MAILTIE FILING DATE:11/10/20DATE - SERVICE:11/14/20NAME:FIRSTKEY MORTGAGE LLC | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | SERVICE COMPLETE - CERTIFIED MAILTIE FILING DATE:11/10/20DATE - SERVICE:11/14/20NAME:TRINA A WEMLINGER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.