Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Professional Tort case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with KIMBERLY COCROFT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2018 |
CategoryProfessional Tort |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
|
MEMO IN SUPPORT
Date: May 11, 2018BRIEF IN OPPOSITION
Date: May 04, 2018COMPLAINT FILED
Date: March 07, 2018MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:01/17/20
Date: January 21, 2020MOTION DENIEDTIE FILING DATE:04/23/19
Date: May 15, 2019AMENDED CASE SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 10, 2020AMENDED CASE SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 18, 2020MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:04/10/20
Date: May 18, 2020MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:04/06/18
Date: June 06, 2018MEMO IN OPPOSITIONTO PLNTFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 02, 2019REQUEST FOR AMENDED CASE SCHEDULENOTICE PRINT DATE:03/02/20NOTICE MAIL DATE:02/10/20
Date: February 10, 2020AMENDED CASE SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 08, 2020AMENDED CASE SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 28, 2020REPLY TO
Date: May 09, 2019MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:01/14/19
Date: January 31, 2019AMENDED CASE SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 13, 2020NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT FILEDNO. OF DAYS:0000NO. OF ALTERNATES:00NO. OF JURORS:00NAME:GERALD J TODARO
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 31, 2021MOTION DENIED IN PARTTIE FILING DATE:08/13/21
Date: August 13, 2021MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:08/30/21
Date: September 03, 2021AMENDED CASE SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 13, 2021NOTICE OF ATTORNEY WITHDRAWAL
Date: August 18, 2020AMENDED CASE SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 03, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONNAME:MARK CALLERYDATE - DEPOSITION:08/04/20
Date: June 16, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONNAME:THOMAS C NAZLUNDDATE - DEPOSITION:08/06/20
Date: July 06, 2020DECISION/ENTRY
Date: August 13, 2021DECISION/ENTRY
Date: May 15, 2019RESPONSE TO
Date: September 02, 2021ENTRY
Date: October 14, 2022DECISION/ENTRY
Date: January 21, 2020AMENDED CASE SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 17, 2021NOTICE OF ATTORNEY WITHDRAWAL
Date: February 03, 2020NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITIONNAME:MARK GRAHAMDATE - DEPOSITION:06/09/20
Date: August 26, 2021NOTICE
Date: February 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:07/31/23TIME - COURTROOM:09:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4E345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:GERALD J TODAROATTORNEY ADDRESS:ARNOLD,TODARO,WELCH CO 2075 MARBLE CLIFF OFFICE COLUMBUS, OH 43215(614) 224-1800NOTICE PRINT DATE:06/01/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:06/01/23 | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:07/31/23TIME - COURTROOM:09:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4E345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:MATTHEW R JANACKATTORNEY ADDRESS:111 EAST SHORELINE DRIVE SANDUSKY, OH 44870-2517(419) 624-3127NOTICE PRINT DATE:06/01/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:06/01/23 | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:07/31/23TIME - COURTROOM:09:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4E345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:JOHN H BURTCHATTORNEY ADDRESS:BAKER & HOSTETLER LLPSUITE 1200200 CIVIC CENTER DRCOLUMBUS, OH 43215-4138(614) 228-1541NOTICE PRINT DATE:06/01/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:06/01/23 | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:07/31/23TIME - COURTROOM:09:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4E345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:JAMES J BRUDNY JRATTORNEY ADDRESS:2075 MARBLE CLIFF OFFICE COLUMBUS, OH 43215(614) 485-1800NOTICE PRINT DATE:06/01/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:06/01/23 | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:07/31/23TIME - COURTROOM:09:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4E345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:ZACHARY J LYONATTORNEY ADDRESS:2075 MARBLE CLIFF OFFICE COLUMBUS, OH 43215(614) 485-1800NOTICE PRINT DATE:06/01/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:06/01/23 | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:07/31/23TIME - COURTROOM:09:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4E345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:JAKE A ELLIOTTATTORNEY ADDRESS:MURRAY & MURRAY111 E SHORELINE DRIVESANDUSKY, OH 44870(419) 626-7009NOTICE PRINT DATE:06/01/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:06/01/23 | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:07/31/23TIME - COURTROOM:09:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4E345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:CHARLES M MURRAYATTORNEY ADDRESS:MURRAY & MURRAY CO LPA 111 EAST SHORELINE DRIVE SANDUSKY, OH 44870(419) 624-3000NOTICE PRINT DATE:06/01/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:06/01/23 | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | STRIKE SCHEDULE DATETIE FILING DATE:09/13/21DATE - COURTROOM:10/24/22TIME - COURTROOM:09:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4E345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215 | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | STRIKE SCHEDULE DATETIE FILING DATE:09/13/21DATE - COURTROOM:11/07/22TIME - COURTROOM:09:00 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4E345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215 | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING/EVENT SCHEDULEDDATE - COURTROOM:07/31/23TIME - COURTROOM:09:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4E345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:FINAL PRE-TRIALNOTICE REQ IND:YNOTC RET ADDR DSC:CLERK OF COURT OF COMMON PLEAS - CIVIL DIVISION NOTICE PRINT DATE:06/01/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:06/01/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.