Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with DAVID C YOUNG presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2017 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
MEMO IN OPPOSITION
Date: March 24, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED - COURT OF APPEALSNAME:SHUCHUN LIPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:P
Date: November 13, 2020ORDER
Date: March 13, 2020ORDER
Date: March 19, 2020FINAL PRE-TRIAL ORDER
Date: April 29, 2020MOTION GRANTED IN PARTTIE FILING DATE:03/06/20
Date: April 29, 2020MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:05/11/20
Date: May 29, 2020MEMO IN OPPOSITIONTO DFNDNTS MOTION IN LIMINE FILED MARCH 6 2020
Date: July 06, 2020MOTION DENIEDTIE FILING DATE:08/07/20
Date: August 13, 2020JURY INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 14, 2020JURY VERDICT - ORDER
Date: October 14, 2020NOTICE RETURNED - NOT SERVED
Date: October 23, 2020SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2020JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: October 16, 2020JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: October 14, 2020APPEAL DISMISSED BY COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:20AP524
Date: June 30, 2021JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: October 05, 2020BRIEF OFNAME:SHUCHUN LIPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:P
Date: September 21, 2020AGREED ORDER
Date: September 28, 2020NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDERNOTICE PRINT DATE:10/16/20NOTICE MAIL DATE:10/16/20
Date: October 16, 2020MOTION DENIEDTIE FILING DATE:03/06/20
Date: August 17, 2020MOTION GRANTED IN PARTTIE FILING DATE:03/06/20
Date: August 17, 2020MEMO IN OPPOSITIONTO PLNTFFS MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: August 17, 2020MOTION RELEASED TO CLEAR DOCKETTIE FILING DATE:03/05/20
Date: August 31, 2020STIPULATION
Date: September 03, 2020TRANSCRIPT - REQUEST TO FILE COURT OF APPEALS
Date: November 13, 2020NOTICE RETURNED - NOT SERVED
Date: November 02, 2020TRANSFER TO VISITING JUDGE
Date: October 05, 2020TRANSFER TO VISITING JUDGE
Date: October 06, 2020RECORD TRANSMITTED TO COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:20AP-524
Date: January 15, 2021TERMINATE CASECASE NUMBER:17CV004974 SUPR CRT TERM CD:16
Date: October 16, 2020OATH OF INTERPRETER
Date: October 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | APPEAL DISMISSED BY COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:20AP524 | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CHECK FROM CRABBE BROWN & JAMES | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | APPLIED - CLERKAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:2.00HOW PAID IND:CHECK/MONEY ORDERINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:6400479PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:SHUCHUN LI | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | SECURITY DEPOSIT RECEIVEDAMOUNT - PAID:2.00HOW PAID IND:CHECK/MONEY ORDERRECEIPT NUMBER:6400479PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:SHUCHUN LI | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORD TRANSMITTED TO COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:20AP-524 | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | TRANSCRIPT - FILED COURT OF APPEALSCRT OF APPEALS NO:20AP-524TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FOR 10/12/2020 | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED - COURT OF APPEALSNAME:SHUCHUN LIPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:P | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | TRANSCRIPT - REQUEST TO FILE COURT OF APPEALS | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | APPLIED - COURT REPORTERAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:175.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:6358159PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:SHUCHUN LI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.