Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Other Civil case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with JAIZA N PAGE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAIZA N PAGE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 11, 2012 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | MASS TRANFER OF JUDGE LOCATIONOLD COURTROOM:COURTROOM 6ANEW COURTROOM:COURTROOM 3E | |
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT FOR FEES AND COSTSPAYEE NAME:KAREN HAMILTONEPAYEE ADDRESS:31 E WHITTIER STCOLUMBUS, OH 43206AMT- DISB/RFND:137.00MEMO AUTH NBR:5750338 | |
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event | APPLIED - E-FILING CHARGEAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:1.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:5750338PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:TEKCOLLECT INC | |
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event | APPLIED - CLERKAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:11.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:5750338PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:TEKCOLLECT INC | |
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT COST BILLAMOUNT - PAID:225.00AMOUNT - FEES AND COSTS :88.00 | |
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | STRIKE SCHEDULE DATETIE FILING DATE:04/01/13DATE - COURTROOM:06/10/13TIME - COURTROOM:09:00 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 6A345 SOUTH HIGH STREET6TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215 | |
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF | |
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event | TERMINATE CASECASE NUMBER:12CV004569 SUPR CRT TERM CD:07 | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:06/10/13TIME - COURTROOM:09:00 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 6A345 SOUTH HIGH STREET6TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:ROBERT J BECK JRATTORNEY ADDRESS:PO BOX 204MARYSVILLE, OH 43040(614) 397-1637NOTICE PRINT DATE:04/02/13NOTICE MAIL DATE:04/01/13 | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:06/10/13TIME - COURTROOM:09:00 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 6A345 SOUTH HIGH STREET6TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:KAREN E HAMILTONATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW31 E WHITTIER STCOLUMBUS, OH 43206(614) 443-7920NOTICE PRINT DATE:04/02/13NOTICE MAIL DATE:04/01/13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.