Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Page, Stephen, filed a(n) Civil Other Complaint case against American Occupational Therapy Association, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County. This case was filed in Fairfield County Superior Courts with TRIMMER, DAVID A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTRIMMER, DAVID A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Other Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFairfield County, OH |
|
ENTRY
Date: January 31, 2023SUMMONS
Date: January 30, 2023ORDER
Date: January 31, 2023CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF CERTIFIED MAIL
Date: January 30, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT RECEIVED Receipt: 473904 Date: 05/17/2023 | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. SECOND NOTICE Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. PAGE, STEPHEN was sent bill for $24.44. Printed on 05/15/2023 11:47:09.54. |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. PAGE, STEPHEN was sent bill for $24.44. Printed on 03/14/2023 13:20:34.82. |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL PAGE RECORD CHARGES Receipt: 469348 Date: 03/14/2023 Receipt: 473949 Date: 05/18/2023 | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FOR- NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Attorney: MATHEWS, TYLER L (0063759) |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Attorney: MATHEWS, TYLER L (0063759) Attorney: ZISKA, JESSI L (0096750) | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR UNOPPOSED MOTION OF DEFENDANT FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Attorney: GLASGOW, AARON M (0075466) |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
ENTRY AGREED ENTRY RE: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Receipt: 469348 Date: 03/14/2023 |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Attorney: GLASGOW, AARON M (0075466) | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY Receipt: 469348 Date: 03/14/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.