Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
17 CV H 10 0585 SUBURBAN NATURAL GAS COMPANY vs. COLUMBIA GAS OF OHIO INC EHK
On October 04, 2017 a (cv) civil common pleas case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. Judge KRUEGER, EVERETT H. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 04, 2017
Last Refreshed
July 11, 2023
Filing Location
Delaware County, OH
Category
(CV) CIVIL COMMON PLEAS
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: Jun 26, 2018JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: May 07, 2018REPLY
Date: Mar 28, 2018MEMORANDUM
Date: Mar 21, 2018MOTION
Date: Mar 07, 2018NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER
Date: Feb 05, 2018JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: Feb 05, 2018REPLY
Date: Dec 08, 2017MEMORANDUM
Date: Nov 22, 2017JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: Nov 17, 2017MOTION FOR EXTENSION
Date: Nov 15, 2017MOTION
Date: Nov 03, 2017SUMMONS CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: Oct 04, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: Oct 04, 2017Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID - NO RECORD | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | INITIAL NOTICE MAILED COLUMBIA GAS OF OHIO INC was sent notice for $ 0.00 Printed on 07/13/2018 07:34:54.76. | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES UNDER RC 2323.51 Receipt: 245939 Date: 07/27/2018 | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED COST DUE - NO RECORD DEFENDANTS MOTION DENIED | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE ENVELOPE Sent on: 06/26/2018 10:50:25.72 Receipt: 245939 Date: 07/27/2018 | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF FILING OF SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF STEPHEN KANDRA III IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT COLUMBIA GAS OF OHIO INC FOR ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO R.C. 2323.51 (E-FILED) Attorney: RECHNER, MATTHEW R (0074446) |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE COPIES OF E-FILING AND CHARGED TO CASE Receipt: 245939 Date: 07/27/2018 |
|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE Receipt: 245939 Date: 07/27/2018 | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY SCHEDULING ORAL HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES ON JUNE 21 2018 AT 8:30 AM Receipt: 245939 Date: 07/27/2018 | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | REPLY OF DEFENDANT COLUMBIA GAS OF OHIO INC TO PLAINTIFF SUBURBAN NATURAL GAS COMPANYS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE COPIES OF E-FILING AND CHARGED TO CASE Receipt: 245939 Date: 07/27/2018 |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES Attorney: MARTIN, STEPHEN D (0010851) |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION OF DEFENDANT COLUMBIA GAS OF OHIO INC FOR ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO R.C. 2323.51 Attorney: RECHNER, MATTHEW R (0074446) | |
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE COPIES OF E-FILING AND CHARGED TO CASE Receipt: 245939 Date: 07/27/2018 |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO.....................................MANOS MARTIN & PERGRAM CO Voided on 02/08/2018. Re-issued Check. | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID - NO RECORD | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER Receipt: 237472 Date: 02/07/2018 | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE VOL 544 PGS 307-312 Receipt: 237472 Date: 02/07/2018 | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE Receipt: 237472 Date: 02/07/2018 | |
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | REPLY OF DEFENDANT COLUMBIA GAS OF OHIO INC TO PLAINTIFF SUBURBAN NATURAL GAS COMPANY'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS (E-FILED) Attorney: RECHNER, MATTHEW R (0074446) | |
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE COPIES OF E-FILING AND CHARGED TO CASE Attorney: RECHNER, MATTHEW R (0074446) Receipt: 237472 Date: 02/07/2018 |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DEFENDANT COLUMBIA GAS OF OHIO INC'S NOTICE OF FILING OF DAVID L PEMBERTON SR PREFILED DIRECT TESTIMONY IN PUCO CASE NO. 13-1216-GA-CSS (E-FILED) Attorney: RECHNER, MATTHEW R (0074446) |
|
November 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY REVISING FILING DEADLINES SEE ENTRY VOL 540 PG 107 Receipt: 237472 Date: 02/07/2018 | |
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE Receipt: 237472 Date: 02/07/2018 | |
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF FILING DATES Attorney: MARTIN, STEPHEN D (0010851) |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION OF DEFENDANT COLUMBIA GAS OF OHIO INC TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION Attorney: RECHNER, MATTHEW R (0074446) | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE COPIES OF E-FILING AND CHARGED TO CASE Receipt: 237472 Date: 02/07/2018 |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL UPON: Method : CIVIL CERTIFIED MAIL Issued : 10/04/2017 Service : INITIAL SERVICE ON COMPLAINT Served : 10/06/2017 Return : 10/12/2017 On : COLUMBIA GAS OF OHIO INC Signed By : DEANNE E SCHAUSEIL Reason : CERT MAIL / SERVICE COMPLETE Comment : Tracking #: 9414726699042106336767 | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT COLUMBIA GAS OF OHIO INC (E-FILED) Attorney: SMITH, ADAM C (0087720) | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE COPIES OF E-FILING AND CHARGED TO CASE Receipt: 237472 Date: 02/07/2018 |
|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO DEFENDANT Receipt: 237472 Date: 02/07/2018 | |
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT Receipt: 237472 Date: 02/07/2018 | |
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL POSTAGE Receipt: 237472 Date: 02/07/2018 | |
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | CLASSIFICATION | |
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | CIVIL FILING FEES Receipt: 232356 Date: 10/04/2017 | |
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | CIVIL / DEPOSIT Receipt: 232356 Date: 10/04/2017 | |
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL Issue Date: 10/04/2017 Service: INITIAL SERVICE ON COMPLAINT Method: CIVIL CERTIFIED MAIL Cost Per: $ COLUMBIA GAS OF OHIO INC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY 50 WEST BROAD STREET STE 1330 COLUMBUS, OH 43215 Tracking No: 9414726699042106336767 |