Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Barbara A. Jackson, filed a(n) Tort-Miscellaneous case represented by Blake A Dickson, Pamela Dimo, against David Cooley, Galion Pointe, Inc., Galion Pointe, Llc, Jag Healthcare, Inc., James Griffiths, (total of 6) See All represented by Bret C Perry, Christopher F Mars, in the jurisdiction of Cuyahoga County, OH, . Cuyahoga County, OH Superior Courts with DAVID T MATIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2022 |
CategoryTort-Miscellaneous |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCuyahoga County, OH |
|
Case Outcome TypeDis. W/Prej |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT 06/10/2022 - GRANTED
Date: February 09, 2022SUBPOENA SERVICE RETURN FILED LABCORP, PAMELA DIMO (0095371) RETURN OF SERVICE ON LABCORP
Date: November 01, 2022BRIEF FILED BY P1 BARBARA A. JACKSON BLAKE A DICKSON 0059329 PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF
Date: October 30, 2023MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING SPECULATION. 11/02/2023 - MOOT
Date: October 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD ON 11/02/2023. ALL COUNSEL PRESENT. THIS CASE SETTLED AND WILL BE DISMISSED PENDING PROBATE COURT APPROVAL. PARTIES TO SUBMIT A FORMAL DISMISSAL ENTRY. THIS COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OVER THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. COURT COST ASSESSED TO THE DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/06/2023 AT 09:30 AM IS CANCELLED. SC |
|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION FILED BY P1 BARBARA A. JACKSON BLAKE A DICKSON 0059329 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION ASKING THE COURT TO EXCLUDE CRITICISIMS OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT CHARLOTTE SHEPPARD, RN BR |
|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT FILED DEFENDANT(S) JAG HEALTHCARE, INC.(D3), DAVID COOLEY(D4) and JAMES GRIFFITHS(D5), BRET C PERRY 0073488 NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT CHARLOTTE SHEPPARD DNP RN-BC LHRM WCC ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS, DAVID COOLEY, JAMES GRIFFITHS, AND JAG HEALTHCARE NT |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING THE ISSUE OF COMPARATIVE NEGLIGENCE 11/02/2023 - MOOT MO |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT FILED P1 BARBARA A. JACKSON, BLAKE A DICKSON 0059329 NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF RHONDA DAVEY NT |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA SERVICE RETURN FILED AMANDA MCADOW, BLAKE A DICKSON (0059329) PROOF OF SERVICE OF TRIAL SUBPOENA MCADOW SR |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
REPLY BRIEF FILED BY P1 BARBARA A. JACKSON BLAKE A DICKSON 0059329 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PERSONNEL FILES BR |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT FILED P1 BARBARA A. JACKSON, BLAKE A DICKSON 0059329 NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF NATALIE BERGER- NT |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA SERVICE RETURN FILED BARBARA BULL, BLAKE A DICKSON (0059329) PROOF OF SERVICE OF TRIAL SUBPOENA BULL SR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.