Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Trailer Park After Dark Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Landay, John K; Roberts, Malcolm, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Michael T. Smyth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael T. Smyth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend filed by Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Waddy Stephenson) filed by Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc; Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 02/25/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 03/04/2022 10:15:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc; Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Answer filed by Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc; Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 06/10/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 07/01/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc.
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed by Marvi, Nader; Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc.
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF WADD STEPHENSON) filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Opposition - Other (to ex parte application) filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/13/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Opposition - Other filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Reply filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to filed Motion filed by Marvi, Nader; Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc.
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Marvi, Nader; Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc.
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 12/02/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Stay filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Marvi, Nader received but not filed on 03/20/2023.
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Opposition - Other filed by Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF BRIAN C DAWSON) filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00Motion - Other (TO STAY PROCEEDINGS) filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Marvi, Nader received but not filed on 04/20/2023.
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2023-05-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2023-05-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2023-05-05T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2023-05-05T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2023-05-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2023-07-10T00:00:00Motion - Other filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2023-09-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 08/18/2023 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2023-08-18T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2023-09-13T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed by Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2023-08-17T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 294]
Date: 2023-09-13T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc.
Date: 2023-09-12T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc.
Date: 2023-09-12T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to filed Motion filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: September 18, 2023Proof of Service filed by Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc.
Date: 2023-09-12T00:00:00Opposition - Other filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: September 18, 2023Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/25/2023 08:15:00 AM.
Date: September 25, 2023Order - Other (Lifting/Terminating Stay) filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: September 28, 2023Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/15/2024 09:00:00 AM.
Date: March 15, 2024Case reassigned from Sturgeon,Eddie to Smyth,Michael effective 02/17/2024
Date: February 17, 2024Proof of Service filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 09/25/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF ALI RAISSADAT) filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/21/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Reply filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF WADDY STEPHENSON) filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/31/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 154]
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Raissadat, Ali.
Date: 2023-07-10T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing published.
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2023-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2023-09-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: March 14, 2024Proof of Service (opposition, declarations) filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint (Proposed) filed by Marvi, Nader. Refers to: Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Marvi, Nader; Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc.
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Reply filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2023-05-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2023-09-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/12/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2023-09-08T00:00:00Motion - Other (for order compelling) filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Waddy Stephenson) filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/06/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 83]
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Order - Other (re Motion) filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Errata filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/16/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc; Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Motion - Other (for order establishing admissions and sanctions) filed by Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Answer filed by Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc; Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Demurrer (to first amended cross complaint) filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (of opposition, declaration) filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/28/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (opposition, declaration) filed by Trailer Park After Dark Inc; Raissadat, Ali.
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/29/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/28/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Ali Raissadat) filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Waddy Stephenson) filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Order - Other (on Motion to Appoint Receiver) filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/19/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Marvi, Nader; Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc.
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/05/2021 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Opposition - Other filed by Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc; Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc; Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc; Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/23/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint (Third) submitted by Marvi, Nader rejected on 05/10/2021.
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 05/21/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/21/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint (Third) filed by Tokyo Playground - San Diego Inc; Marvi, Nader.
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Raissadat, Ali; Trailer Park After Dark Inc.
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.