We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Cavalry Spv I Llc Vs Thompson

Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago

Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Pack, Tiffany A, against Thompson, Marian, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Paula S. Rosenstein presiding.

Case Details for Cavalry Spv I Llc v. Thompson, Marian

Judge

Paula S. Rosenstein Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

December 31, 2019

Category

Civil - Limited

Last Refreshed

September 20, 2023

Practice Area

Creditor

Filing Location

San Diego County, CA

Matter Type

Collections

Filing Court House

Superior

Parties for Cavalry Spv I Llc v. Thompson, Marian

Plaintiffs

Cavalry Spv I Llc

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Pack, Tiffany A

Defendants

Thompson, Marian

Case Events for Cavalry Spv I Llc v. Thompson, Marian

Type Description
Docket Event Notice of Case Reassignment SD
Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 03/18/2023.
Docket Event Notice of Case Reassignment SD
Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 07/30/2022.
Docket Event Declaration of Non-Service filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Thompson, Marian
Docket Event Declaration of Non-Service filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Thompson, Marian
Docket Event Notice of Case Reassignment SD
Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/12/2020.
Docket Event Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD
Case initiation form printed.
Docket Event Summons issued.
Docket Event Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Thompson, Marian
Docket Event Original Summons filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC. Refers to: Thompson, Marian
Docket Event Case assigned to Department 903.
See all events