We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Td Bank Usa Na Vs Bryce

Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago

Td Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Berk, Camryn P, against Bryce, Cindy M, represented by Moreno-Cortez, S. Jenna, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with John S. Meyer presiding.

Case Details for Td Bank Usa Na v. Bryce, Cindy M

Judge

John S. Meyer Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

December 31, 2019

Category

Civil - Limited

Last Refreshed

February 23, 2021

Practice Area

Creditor

Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions

217 days

Filing Location

San Diego County, CA

Matter Type

Collections

Case Cycle Time

217 days

Parties for Td Bank Usa Na v. Bryce, Cindy M

Plaintiffs

Td Bank Usa Na

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Berk, Camryn P

Defendants

Bryce, Cindy M

Attorneys for Defendants

Moreno-Cortez, S. Jenna

Case Events for Td Bank Usa Na v. Bryce, Cindy M

Type Description
Docket Event Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.
Docket Event Minute Order
Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Docket Event Notice of Dismissal SD generated.
Docket Event Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/11/2020 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.
Docket Event Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Docket Event Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by TD BANK USA NA.
Docket Event Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD
Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 12/11/2020 at 09:45:00 AM in C-64 before John S. Meyer at Central.
Docket Event Notice of Case Reassignment SD
Case reassigned from C-61 to John Meyer effective 02/03/2020
Docket Event Notice of Hearing SD
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/07/2020 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.
Docket Event Answer filed by BRYCE, CINDY M.
See all events