Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, As Indenture Trustee, For The Holders Of The Cim Trust 2017-7, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2017-7, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Nardolillo, Michael William, Thibaut, Juliana, Vartolo, Ralph Lawrence, against Amy L. Sherman Aka Amy L. Wooden, Christopher S. Wooden Aka Christophe Wooden, John Doe And Jane Doe, Sterling Jewelers Inc. Dba Kay Outlet, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1) 90-Day Notice Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 08, 2021ORDER - AMENDED Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 28, 2021ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: September 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F 90-Day Notices Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Exhibit 3 (Summons and Complaint) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G 1306 Proof of Filing Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Assignment of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 25, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Loan Modification Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 08, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2) Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 08, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 25, 2021NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 08, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2021AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2) SCRA Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 29, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: August 23, 2022BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2) Loan Modification Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2021NOTICE OF SALE
Date: July 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2021ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: November 10, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1) Assignment of mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2) Assignment of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 29, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 29, 2022JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: June 01, 2022AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) Loan Modification Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1) Assignment of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1) SCRA Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1) 1306 Proof of Filing Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2022OATH
Date: March 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 31, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: March 31, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 08, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 20, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
August 23, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing | ||
July 06, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
July 06, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing | ||
June 09, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
June 09, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing, Notice of Entry | ||
June 01, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
April 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR Assignments of Mortgage Redacted |
||
April 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Oath & Report |
||
April 29, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.