Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Tatyana Urbanovich, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Shapiro, Alexander T, against Westchester Medical Center, Westchester Medical Center Health Care Corporation, represented by Bave, William H, Weis, Claudine L, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Lewis Jay Lubell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
This legal document is a complaint filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings. The plaintiff, Tatyana Urbanovich, is the administrator of the estate of Alexander Urbanovich and is also named individually. The defendants incl...
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 04, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: December 28, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 02, 2024PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 15, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 15, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: December 14, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 14, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2024 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Adjourning Motion 1 |
||
January 02, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 28, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
December 15, 2023 |
PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOS of Motion Papers by mail and email |
||
December 15, 2023 |
PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOS NYSCEF notification assignment of Judge Lubell |
||
December 14, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 14, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) William H. Bave - Affirmation in Support of Motion to Change Venue |
||
December 14, 2023 |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) NO FEE AUTHORIZATION LETTER |
||
December 14, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 14, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion (Change Venue) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.