Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Dorinda Sylvester, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Rich, Jeffrey Michael, against Jennifer Choe Dds, Jennifer Choe, Dds P.C., John G Habib Dental P.C., Yonkers Dental Group P.C., represented by Dedonato, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Lewis Jay Lubell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 25, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: October 25, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: October 23, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 13, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 02, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: September 01, 2023STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 05, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: October 10, 2023NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE
Date: October 06, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 26, 2023NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 26, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE
Date: October 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 25, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 23, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
October 10, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 06, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Affirmation of Service |
||
October 06, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE | ||
September 05, 2023 | STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
September 05, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
September 01, 2023 | STIPULATION - OTHER | ||
September 01, 2023 | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.