Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Carrington Mortgage Services Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bhatia, Raspreet, Weiss, Meir David, against Any And All Known And Unknown Heirs, Devisees, Grantees, Assignees, Lienors, Creditors, Trustees And All Other Parties Claiming An Interest By, Through, Under Or Against The Estate Of Frank V. Allan, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, Said Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, Intended To Be Possible Tenants Or Occupants Of The Premises, Or Corporations, Persons, Or Other Entities Having Or Claiming A Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, Renata Allan, As Heir, Devisee, Distributee Of The Estate Of Frank V. Allan, Stanley E. Esposito, As Possible Executor Of The Estate Of Frank V. Allan, (total of 10) See All represented by Esposito, Stanley E, Gura, John E., in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Joan B Lefkowitz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoan B Lefkowitz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 18, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Any And All Known And Unknown Heirs, Devisees, Grantees, Assignees, Lienors, Creditors, Trustees And All Other Parties Claiming An Interest By, Through, Under Or Against The Estate Of Frank V. Allan
John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, Said Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, Intended To Be Possible Tenants Or Occupants Of The Premises, Or Corporations, Persons, Or Other Entities Having Or Claiming A Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 06, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 30, 2024ORDER - APPOINTING COUNSEL TO GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: January 04, 2024ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 06, 2023SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: December 27, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 22, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 06, 2023ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 06, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: August 09, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 06, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 06, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 02 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 01 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 06, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 06, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: May 18, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: May 18, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 18, 2023SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: May 18, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: May 18, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: June 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2023SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: June 06, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED)
Date: June 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 14, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: July 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 22, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 04, 2024 | ORDER - APPOINTING COUNSEL TO GUARDIAN AD LITEM | ||
December 27, 2023 | SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) | ||
December 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 27, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 04, 2023 |
ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM (Motion #1) Order Granting Service by Publication and Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem |
||
November 06, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
November 06, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
November 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) EX B - AMENDED CMPT AMENDED SUMMONS AMENDED NOP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.