Case Last Refreshed: 8 hours ago
Mauro Mandia, Robert Sullivan As Administrators Of The Estate Of C.M., Deceased, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Bochetto, George Alexander, Minsky, Matthew Louis, Vecchio, Richard S, against Ef Education First, Inc., Ef International Academy, Inc., Jacklyn Maki, Stephanie Hendrick, represented by Gentile, Donald Joseph, Oxman, Marc Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Supreme with Lewis Jay Lubell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2024 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint involves Plaintiffs Mauro Mandia and Robert Sullivan, as Administrators of the Estate of C.M., deceased, against Defendants EF International Academy, Inc., EF Education First, Inc., Stephanie Hendrick, and Jacklyn Maki. The nature of t...
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 04, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 03, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: March 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2) Deposition Excerpt - Giovanni Villari
Date: March 15, 2024ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 15, 2024AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 15, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 13, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 13, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: March 15, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 13, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 13, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 13, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 13, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 13, 2024ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 19, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 13, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2024 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Pro Hac Vice |
||
April 04, 2024 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Adjourning Motion |
||
April 03, 2024 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER (Motion #2) | ||
March 28, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 15, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Deposition Excerpt - Giovanni Villari Deposition Excerpt - Giovanni Villari Redacted |
||
March 15, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Crisis Protocol |
||
March 15, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint |
||
March 15, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Complaint - Original Lawsuit |
||
March 15, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) Affirmation In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss |
||
March 15, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected* Notice of Motion to Dismiss REFILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.