Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cdc Development Properties, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Blumenstock, John U., Kaye, Andrew Charles, Klar, Howard P., against American Independent Paper Mills Supply Co., Inc., Hudson Harbor Homes, Inc., represented by Constantine, Mark E, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Nicholas Colabella presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNicholas Colabella Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management585 days |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2015 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 21, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #14)
Date: January 07, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #14)
Date: December 20, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 20, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: January 11, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 11, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 21, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 24, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN
Date: May 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 05, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #14)
Date: January 07, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: November 15, 2018ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: March 26, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 13, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 20, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 15, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 27, 2019NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: March 26, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 03, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 03, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 27, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 12, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 22, 2019ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - OPPOSITION TO REQUEST
Date: July 10, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 21, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 22, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 09, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 10, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 10, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 01, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 14, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 09, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 21, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 23, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 09, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 16, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 14, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 06, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 06, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 16, 2015RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 29, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 09, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 18, 2019NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: October 31, 2018NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: January 04, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 17, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #17)
Date: July 29, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #18)
Date: October 28, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #19)
Date: April 05, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #18)
Date: February 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #18)
Date: October 28, 2020NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT
Date: July 30, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 20, 2020JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 30, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #17)
Date: July 29, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #17)
Date: July 23, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: December 02, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #18)
Date: November 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: December 17, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 21, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 24, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: December 02, 2020NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT Â (Motion #17)
Date: July 30, 2020JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #17)
Date: July 30, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #18)
Date: May 03, 2021ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: July 29, 2021ORDER - TRIAL READINESS
Date: July 19, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 02, 2015NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 24, 2017JUDGMENT - DECLARATORY
Date: August 04, 2020ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: July 29, 2019ORDER - TRIAL READINESS
Date: February 23, 2017ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 20, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 09, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 30, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 14, 2016DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 05, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 19, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 09, 2015ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: November 07, 2016NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: October 19, 2016STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: June 18, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 19, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 09, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 02, 2015INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 19, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: April 04, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 05, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 06, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 04, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: May 06, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 05, 2015RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 02, 2016ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 29, 2016REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: May 12, 2015ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Â (Motion #13)
Date: December 05, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #12)
Date: September 17, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 06, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 14, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 20, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 20, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 14, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: December 21, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 03, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 24, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 15, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: January 29, 2018TRIAL MEMORANDUM
Date: January 29, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #12)
Date: September 18, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 29, 2018ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 09, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 15, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 19, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: February 20, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 25, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 05, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 26, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 29, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: October 31, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: January 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 19, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #7)
Date: January 29, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #10)
Date: March 06, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: March 28, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #14)
Date: December 20, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 20, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 24, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 13, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 08, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 05, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 11, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 28, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #7)
Date: January 30, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #14)
Date: January 30, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: February 01, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 30, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 16, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 30, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 30, 2019PRE-TRIAL MEMORANDUM
Date: February 20, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 05, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 21, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 27, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 01, 2019ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 22, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 10, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #14)
Date: January 05, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 18, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 12, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 23, 2019ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 30, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 24, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: January 18, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 23, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #12)
Date: September 17, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 27, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 31, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 31, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 16, 2018ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: January 31, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 30, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 06, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 25, 2019ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: December 20, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 26, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 26, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 28, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 10, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 04, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 24, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #9)
Date: February 21, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 26, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2021 | ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING | ||
July 26, 2021 | Hearing |
Held Clerkin, Diane - TRP Conference Part TEAMS MEETING |
|
July 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned Clerkin, Diane - TRP Conference Part TEAMS MEETING |
|
July 19, 2021 | ORDER - TRIAL READINESS | ||
July 19, 2021 |
NOTICE Virtual appearance - Trial Ready Dismissal Calendar |
||
July 16, 2021 | Hearing |
Clerkin, Diane - TRP Conference Part TEAMS MEETING |
|
July 16, 2021 |
NOTICE Virtual appearance - Trial Ready Dismissal Calendar |
||
July 12, 2021 | Hearing |
Clerkin, Diane - TRP Conference Part TEAMS MEETING |
|
July 12, 2021 |
NOTICE Virtual appearance - Trial Ready Dismissal Calendar |
||
July 09, 2021 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.