Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
County Of Wayne, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case against Civil Service Employees Association Inc, in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts with Barrett, Hon. Daniel G. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
PETITION
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 25, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 25, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: August 25, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: August 25, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 06, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 14, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
October 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Withdrawn Barrett (Court Activity) Judge: Barrett, Hon. Daniel G. |
|
October 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted Barrett (Court Activity) Judge: Barrett, Hon. Daniel G. |
|
October 14, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
October 12, 2021 | Hearing |
Discontinued Barrett (Court Activity) Judge: Barrett, Hon. Daniel G. |
|
October 12, 2021 | Hearing |
(Motion #001) Barrett (Motion Part) Judge: Barrett, Hon. Daniel G. |
|
October 12, 2021 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Barrett (Motion Part) Judge: Barrett, Hon. Daniel G. |
|
October 06, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 01, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 31, 2021 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 10/12/2021Decided Before Justice: Barrett, Hon. Daniel G. Answer demanded: No Judge: Barrett, Hon. Daniel G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.