Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Barreto, Jonathan Alexander, Sheerin, John J, against Mark William Daciw, in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 02, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 30, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 24, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE DISCONTINUING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE |
||
October 05, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT |
||
June 24, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
June 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 02, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Mark William Daciw |
||
June 02, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 02, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Credit Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.