Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Five Star Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Mcandrew, John Kevin, against Renee J. Lafferty, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Martin D Auffredou presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 29, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 03, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: October 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 03, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: October 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 03, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: September 29, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: July 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2023AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: September 29, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 25, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: September 29, 2023202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: September 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 29, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 29, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: September 29, 2023ORDER - AWARDING FEE
Date: October 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 03, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 03, 2023 | Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | ||
October 03, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT Aff of investigator and military pull |
||
October 03, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT Aff of additional mailing |
||
October 03, 2023 | ORDER - AWARDING FEE | ||
September 29, 2023 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
September 29, 2023 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES | ||
September 29, 2023 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
September 29, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exh A to Fee Aff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.