Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lux Ithaca Holdings, Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Spellane, Philip Gerard, against Board Of Assessment Review Of The City And Town Of Ithaca, Tompkins County, New York, Board Of Assessors Of The City And Town Of Ithaca, Tompkins County, New York, represented by Macleod, Kevin R., Speno, Rebecca Michele, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with JOSEPH R. CASSIDY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOSEPH R. CASSIDY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 27, 2020NOTICE OF PETITION (UPDATED RETURN DATE)
Date: July 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 13, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 27, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 09, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 27, 2020NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: October 27, 2020ASSIGNED RJI
Date: July 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 27, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: January 26, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: January 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 08, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 08, 2021MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE)
Date: October 28, 2020ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: March 01, 2021ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 12, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 06, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 27, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 27, 2020PETITION (AMENDED)
Date: October 08, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 27, 2020NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 27, 2020PETITION
Date: July 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) Order denying Respondents' motion to dismiss |
||
April 13, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
March 01, 2021 | ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
January 29, 2021 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #002) CASSIDY (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JOSEPH R. CASSIDY |
|
January 26, 2021 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
January 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Petition and Petition on Assessor |
||
January 08, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
January 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Amended Notice of Petition and Petition |
||
January 08, 2021 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
January 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Notice of Petition and Petition filed 7.27.20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.