Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Marie Holdings, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kreppein, Scott Joseph, against Bruce Kennedy, Bruce Kennedy P.C., represented by Small, Andrew Bruce, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with David T Reilly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid T Reilly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Escrow) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
RJI (AMENDED)
Date: January 23, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: October 18, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 19, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: October 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2023SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/O RJI
Date: October 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance obo Kennedy Defendants |
||
January 23, 2024 |
RJI (AMENDED) to reflect related cases |
||
January 02, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE re related cases assigned to Justice Bergman |
||
October 26, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Correspondence re payment from escrow |
||
October 19, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Gubitosi Affidavit |
||
October 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Executed Forbearance Agreement |
||
October 19, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
October 18, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 11, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.