We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Fort Salonga Property Owners Association, William C. Berg, Thomas P. Cleere, Mark C. Henry, Lisa Knopp, Andrew J. Rapiejko V. The Planning Board Of The Town Of Huntington, The Preserve At Indian Hills, Llc, The Northwind Group, Llc, Fort Slongo, Llc,

Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago

Andrew J. Rapiejko, Fort Salonga Property Owners Association, Lisa Knopp, Mark C. Henry, Thomas P. Cleere, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Crapanzano, Gregory Albert, Fribley, James Wesley, against Bruce Roberg, Fort Slongo, Llc, Michael J. Cahill Trustee, The Maude D. Roberg Revocable Living Trust, The Northwind Group, Llc, (total of 7) See All represented by Carroll, Patricia Mary, Macy, Joseph Edward, Napolitano, Donna Anne, Pasca, Anthony Charles, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Joseph Farneti presiding.

Case Details for Andrew J. Rapiejko v. Bruce Roberg , et al.

Judge

Joseph Farneti Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

May 19, 2023

Category

Special Proceedings - Cplr Article 78

Last Refreshed

January 31, 2024

Practice Area

Administrative

Filing Location

Suffolk County, NY

Matter Type

Agency Action

Parties for Andrew J. Rapiejko v. Bruce Roberg , et al.

Plaintiffs

Andrew J. Rapiejko

Fort Salonga Property Owners Association

Lisa Knopp

Mark C. Henry

Thomas P. Cleere

William C. Berg

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Crapanzano, Gregory Albert

Fribley, James Wesley

Defendants

Bruce Roberg

Fort Slongo, Llc

Michael J. Cahill Trustee

The Maude D. Roberg Revocable Living Trust

The Northwind Group, Llc

The Planning Board Of The Town Of Huntington

The Preserve At Indian Hills, Llc

Attorneys for Defendants

Carroll, Patricia Mary

Macy, Joseph Edward

Napolitano, Donna Anne

Pasca, Anthony Charles

Case Documents for Andrew J. Rapiejko v. Bruce Roberg , et al.

NOTICE OF ENTRY

Date: November 15, 2023

COURT NOTICE

Date: August 24, 2023

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY

Date: August 09, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 14

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 13

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 12

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 16

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 24

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 17

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 27

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 25

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 23

Date: May 19, 2023

AFFIRMATION

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 26

Date: May 19, 2023

AFFIRMATION

Date: July 07, 2023

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

Date: July 07, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 22

Date: May 19, 2023

NOTICE OF MOTION

Date: July 07, 2023

AFFIDAVIT

Date: May 25, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 10

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 9

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 1

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 8

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 2

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 3

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 6

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 5

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 4

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 11

Date: May 19, 2023

NOTICE OF MOTION

Date: July 12, 2023

COURT NOTICE

Date: August 07, 2023

AFFIRMATION

Date: May 19, 2023

PETITION

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 7

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 18

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 21

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 19

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 20

Date: May 19, 2023

EXHIBIT(S)  - 15

Date: May 19, 2023

RJI -RE: OTHER

Date: May 19, 2023

Case Events for Andrew J. Rapiejko v. Bruce Roberg , et al.

Type Description
NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Petitioners' Notice of Appeal, Copy of Decision, Order and Judgment Appealed From, Informational Sta
Petitioners' Notice of Appeal, Copy of Decision, Order and Judgment Appealed From, Informational Sta ... show more
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
SFO for Mot Seq #1-4
NOTICE OF ENTRY
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
COURT NOTICE
Filing on Behalf of - Chambers of the Hon. Joseph Farneti
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #004)
July 13, 2021 Resolution 2021-418
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004)
Reply Affirmation
COURT NOTICE
Filing on Behalf of - Chambers of the Hon. Joseph Farneti
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003)
Report by Lawrence E. Kelly
See all events