Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, For Residential Asset Securities Corporation, Home Equity Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-Emx8,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, against Bank Of America, N.A., Clerk Of The Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency, Constantina Brown A K A Tina Brown, Denny Brown, John Doe, (total of 6) See All represented by Gallo, David A, Schwartz, Beth Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with John H Rouse presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time322 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 25, 2019ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #001)
Date: January 09, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: October 11, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 03, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 29, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 21, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 07, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 19, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Filed by AKC - Case Number 20190154 |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #001) | |
October 30, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) MOTION PART 12 EFILED Judge: JOHN H. ROUSE |
|
October 29, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 12 EFILED Judge: JOHN H. ROUSE |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Filed by MXT - 20190154 |
|
October 11, 2019 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION (Motion #001) Decided: 01/07/2020CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: JOHN H. ROUSE Answer demanded: No Judge: JOHN H. ROUSE |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - - (Motion #001) Supportng Documents |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.