Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Ashley Bracco, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Suris, Raymond Joseph, against Marcus O. Nieves, Skyway Truck Parts Inc., represented by Philbin, Kevin J., Scahill, Francis J, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Supreme with Frank Tinari presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank Tinari Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk. The plaintiff, Ashley Bracco, is suing the defendants, Skyway Truck Parts Inc. and Marcus O. Nieves. The complaint alleges that on August 14, 2...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 08, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001) Plaintiff EBT Transcript
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 27, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 22, 2024STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 27, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 27, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2024STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 27, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 27, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 22, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 23, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 21, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: August 21, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 22, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: June 12, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 31, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 13, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 28, 2023ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR
Date: March 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 20, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: February 02, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 02, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2024 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002) | ||
March 27, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) neuro IME |
||
March 27, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) | ||
March 27, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) ortho IME |
||
March 27, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) | ||
March 27, 2024 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #002) | ||
March 27, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) | ||
March 08, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | ||
March 08, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) | ||
February 23, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.