Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Femminella, Nicole P, against Clare Behrens, James Behrens, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Foreclosure Conference Justice presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeForeclosure Conference Justice Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time145 days |
John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 17, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 26, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2015NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT)
Date: December 26, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 07, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2015CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: February 17, 2015CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS
Date: May 20, 2015RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 17, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 20, 2015NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 20, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 09, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 08, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 09, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 07, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | |
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
May 07, 2015 | Hearing |
FSC - SETTLED: LOAN MOD (U) FSC RIVERHEAD/A STIP/DISC EFILED W/CC 5/20/15 Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE JUSTICE |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT | |
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - CLARE BEHRENS |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.