Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Federal National Mortgage Association "Fannie Mae" A Corporation Organized And Existing Under The Laws Of The United States, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., Gaitas, Margarita, against Capital One Bank, Citibank, N.A., Frank Amato, Joseph Tarantello, Matthew Amato, (total of 5) See All represented by Thompson, Christopher H., in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Robert F Quinlan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert F Quinlan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 31, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF SALE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 02, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 02, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2023COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: April 04, 2023APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: March 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #010)
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #010)
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #010)
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #010)
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #010)
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #010)
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #010)
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: May 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 23, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #010)
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 13, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #010)
Date: May 23, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 23, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: May 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #010)
Date: June 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: June 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: June 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #012)
Date: June 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #011)
Date: June 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #012)
Date: June 19, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #012) *Corrected*
Date: June 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #011)
Date: June 19, 2023ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE Â (Motion #010)
Date: June 22, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #010)
Date: June 22, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #012)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #012)
Date: June 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #012)
Date: June 19, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #011)
Date: June 22, 2023NOTICE OF SALE
Date: August 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 03, 2024 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
January 02, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 02, 2024 | Notice of Entry | ||
August 31, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 07, 2023 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
June 22, 2023 |
ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #010) Signed Order - 6/21/23 |
||
June 22, 2023 |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #010) Order dated 6/21/23 |
||
June 22, 2023 |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #012) Order dated 6/21/23 |
||
June 22, 2023 |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #011) Order dated 6/21/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.