Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Village Green At Sayville Llc, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Nt) case represented by Deluca, Matthew Joseph, against The Building Department Of The Town Of Islip, The Planning Board Of The Town Of Islip, The Town Board Of The Town Of Islip, The Town Engineer Of The Town Of Islip, The Town Of Islip, (total of 5) See All represented by Factor, Lilia, Perillo, Lisa Angela, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Kathy G Bergmann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathy G Bergmann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 13, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Nt) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
|
MOTION PAPERS W/EXHIBITS (PRIOR TO CONVERSION) Â - 1 Motion #1
Date: January 16, 2024STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 25, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 16, 2024CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: July 21, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 13, 2023COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: March 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 03, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: April 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 03, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: April 25, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 31, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 31, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 |
MOTION PAPERS W/EXHIBITS (PRIOR TO CONVERSION) - 1 Motion #1 Motion #1 Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
January 16, 2024 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation on Contents of Pre-Conversion Record |
||
October 25, 2023 | STIPULATION - OTHER | ||
September 07, 2023 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING (Motion #002) scheduling 10/26/23 11am in person conference |
||
July 21, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
May 31, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 31, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 05, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 25, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
April 20, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Affirmation in Opposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.