Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Carrington Mortgage Services Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brennan, Jennifer R., Rugino, Edward, against Leanne M Callahan, Richard J Goodliff, Richard J Goodliff Ii, in the jurisdiction of Seneca County, NY, . Seneca County, NY Superior Courts with William K Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam K Taylor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIRMATION
Date: May 10, 2022RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 18, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 10, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: December 01, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 10, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: September 20, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: December 01, 2016AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 10, 2022ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 10, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: May 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2022 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
May 10, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
May 10, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
May 10, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE (Motion #3) NOTICE OF MOTION- CANCELLING LIS PENDENS |
||
May 10, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
May 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE |
||
May 10, 2022 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
May 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) ORDER OF REFERENCE |
||
May 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) NOTICE OF PENDENCY |
||
September 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Notice of Conversion to eFiling with Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.