Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Christine Vanlew, Parkwood Plaza Ii Llc As Third Party, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Meyer, Christopher Paul, Ryan, Edward P, against Clad Realty Llc, Corri Inc As Third Party, Parkwood Plaza Ii Llc, represented by Dolan, Mark J, Nash, Shawn T, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with James E Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames E Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: January 19, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 18, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 02, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 18, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 17, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 14, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 24, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 31, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 30, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 22, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 25, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: November 30, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: December 02, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 06, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 21, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 22, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 25, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: February 22, 2021ANSWER
Date: May 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: February 22, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 04, 2020THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: February 22, 2021ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 10, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 30, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 22, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 22, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 25, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 04, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 30, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 20, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 18, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 28, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 22, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 16, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 09, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 20, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 20, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 10, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 08, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 10, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 16, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 20, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 08, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 17, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 20, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 17, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 10, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 18, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 18, 2020CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: January 19, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 28, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 27, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 20, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 17, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 10, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 14, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
February 10, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
June 06, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 02, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
November 30, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
November 18, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 27, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 03, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
August 31, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.